LOVELACE v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: TERRELL ANDRE LOVELACE
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 2:2020cv04925
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY R RICE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 Social Security Magistrate Consent by TERRELL ANDRE LOVELACE.. (HALL, JAMIE)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT, HAVING SERVED NOTICE TO PLFF TERRELL ANDRE LOVELACE ON 10/6/2020, TO FILE A FORM CONSENTING OR DECLINING THE JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE (DOC. 3) WITHIN 21 DAYS, & PLFF HAS FAILED TO FILE THE FORM WITHIN THAT TIME PERIOD, PLFF IS DIRECTED TO FILE THE FORM WITHIN 10 DAYS, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 10/28/20. 10/28/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 Supplemental Procedural Order 10/7/20 Entered and copies e-mailed. (mbh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2020: #1 Standing Procedural Order) (kw, ).
October 6, 2020 Summons issued electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to Acceptance of Service Agreement dated July 6, 2020. (mbh, )
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONS AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(i) BY ELECTRONIC MEANS VIA THE COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT/ELECTRONIC CASE FILES SYSTEM ("CM/ECF") UPON: THE OFFICE OF THE REGIONAL CHIEF COUNSEL, REGION III, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AND THE UNTED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL. THE CLERK'S OFFICE WILL ENSURE THAT CM/ECF NOTIFICATIONS INDICATING THAT THE COMPLAINT HAS BEEN FILED AND SUMMONSES HAVE BEEN ISSUED ARE SENT TO OGC.EDPA.COMPLAINTS@SSA.GOV AND USAPAE.SSACOMPLAINTS@USDOJ.GOV. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 10/6/20. 10/7/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Consent)(mbh, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by TERRELL ANDRE LOVELACE.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HALL, JAMIE)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by TERRELL ANDRE LOVELACE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 USM-285 Form, #6 USM-285 Form, #7 USM-285 Form, #8 Case Management Tracking Form, #9 Designation Form)(HALL, JAMIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOVELACE v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRELL ANDRE LOVELACE
Represented By: JAMIE RYAN HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?