HANEY-FILIPPONE v. AGORA CYBER CHARTER SCHOOL
Plaintiff: HEATHER HANEY-FILIPPONE
Defendant: AGORA CYBER CHARTER SCHOOL
Case Number: 2:2020cv05303
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDERED THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) IS SCHEDULED, VIA TELEPHONE, FOR TUESDAY, DECEMBER 29, 2020 AT 10:00 A.M. BEFORE THE HON. CHAD F. KENNEY AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 12/2/20. 12/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
November 25, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by AGORA CYBER CHARTER SCHOOL. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(FLYNN, CAROLYN) Modified on 11/30/2020 (tjd).
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDERED THAT THE EVIDENTIARY HEARING SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 17, 2020 AT 11:00 A.M. BEFORE THE HON. CHAD F. KENNEY, IS CANCELLED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 11/12/20. 11/12/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT REGARDING WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 11/10/20.11/12/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
November 10, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Rule of Civil Procedure 65 for Withdrawal of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Without Prejudice by HEATHER HANEY-FILIPPONE. (OBOD, MARJORIE)
November 10, 2020 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY Status TeleConference held on 11/10/20. (jaa, )
November 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES J. MUNNELLY on behalf of AGORA CYBER CHARTER SCHOOL (MUNNELLY, JAMES)
November 6, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Pretrial Order regarding Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction by HEATHER HANEY-FILIPPONE. (OBOD, MARJORIE)
November 5, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HEATHER HANEY-FILIPPONE re: Steve Sachs - it's Done! Courier served Summons and Complaint upon AGORA CYBER CHARTER SCHOOL. AGORA CYBER CHARTER SCHOOL served on 11/4/2020, answer due 11/25/2020. (OBOD, MARJORIE)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED THAT RULE IS HEREBY ISSUED UPON DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 10, 2020 AND IN THAT RESPONSE ALSO ADDRESS (1) HOW A PUBLIC SCHOOL CHARTERED UNDER THE LAWS OF PENNSYLVANIA AND CONSIDERED A PUBLIC SCHOOL CAN PROCLAIM ITSELF PRIVATE AS TO THE LEGAL REQUIREMENTS THAT APPLY TO ALL PUBLIC SCHOOLS REGARDLESS OF CONTRACTUAL CONSIDERATIONS SUCH AS A CBA, (2) WHETHER SUCH A PUBLIC SCHOOL CAN DECIDE WHO AND WHO CANNOT ATTEND BECAUSE IT IS PRIVATE AND IF IT CANNOT, HOW DOES THIS DIFFER FROM DECIDING SOME LAWS APPLY TO IT AND OTHERS DO NOT BECAUSE IT IS A PRIVATE ENTITY OPERATING A PUBLIC SCHOOL UNDER ALL THE PENNSYLVANIA LAWS, RULES, AND REGULATIONS AND ACCEPTING EDUCATIONAL TAX DOLLARS FOR EACH STUDENT ENROLLED, AND (3) RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING AN APPROPRIATE BOND 2 SHOULD A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ISSUE. SEE FED.R.CIV.P. 65(C); ZAMBELLI FIREWORKS MFG. CO. V. WOOD, 592 F.3D 412 (3D CIR. 2010). THE PARTIES MUST ALSO MEET AND CONFER ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 6, 2020 TO SEE IF THEY CAN REACH A RESOLUTION AND, IF NOT, WHO THEY NEED TO PRESENT AS WITNESSES IF THE RECORD CANNOT BE STIPULATED TO BY WAY OF ATTORNEY AGREEMENT AND AFFIDAVITS IF NEEDED. PLAINTIFF MUST ALSO SUBMIT ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 6, 2020 A PROPOSED ORDER THAT STRICTLY COMPLIES WITH FED. R. CIV. P. 65, WITHOUT REFERENCE TO DOCUMENTS, AND TO PROVIDE FOR A BOND SUM IN THAT PROPOSED ORDER. AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING WILL BE HELD ON NOVEMBER 17, 2020 AT 11:00 A.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY, AT 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106, IN A COURTROOM TO BE DETERMINED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 11/5/20. 11/5/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
November 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Rule of Civil Procedure 65 filed by HEATHER HANEY-FILIPPONE.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(OBOD, MARJORIE)
November 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN NAYLOR FLYNN on behalf of AGORA CYBER CHARTER SCHOOL (FLYNN, CAROLYN)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by CLAIRE BLEWITT on behalf of HEATHER HANEY-FILIPPONE (BLEWITT, CLAIRE)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHARINE VIRGINIA HARTMAN on behalf of HEATHER HANEY-FILIPPONE (HARTMAN, KATHARINE)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 Praecipe to Attach Verification to Plaintiff's Complaint by HEATHER HANEY-FILIPPONE. (Attachments: #1 Verification)(OBOD, MARJORIE)
October 26, 2020 Summons Issued as to AGORA CYBER CHARTER SCHOOL. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 10/26/2020 (bw, )
October 23, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by HEATHER HANEY-FILIPPONE. (JL)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AGORA CYBER CHARTER SCHOOL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14662704.), filed by HEATHER HANEY-FILIPPONE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Designation Form, #7 Case Management Track Form)(OBOD, MARJORIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HANEY-FILIPPONE v. AGORA CYBER CHARTER SCHOOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGORA CYBER CHARTER SCHOOL
Represented By: CAROLYN NAYLOR FLYNN
Represented By: JAMES J. MUNNELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER HANEY-FILIPPONE
Represented By: MARJORIE M. OBOD
Represented By: CLAIRE BLEWITT
Represented By: KATHARINE VIRGINIA HARTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?