BALAS v. STANISH et al
Plaintiff: JOHN BALAS
Defendant: PAM SMITH and DR. STANISH
Case Number: 2:2020cv05386
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 DOC. 5 MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg, )
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 11/3/20. 11/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE(mbh, )
November 2, 2020 Document #4 mailed to pro se plff. (kw, )
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by JOHN BALAS. (bw, )
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against PAM SMITH, STANISH, filed by JOHN BALAS. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form)(bw, )
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by JOHN BALAS..(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BALAS v. STANISH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN BALAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAM SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. STANISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?