LYNCH v. GALLANT et al
Plaintiff: CRAIG LYNCH
Defendant: EDWARD J GALLANT, III and LUKE EDWARD GALLANT
Case Number: 2:2020cv05641
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JAN E DUBOIS
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. RYAN, JR on behalf of EDWARD J GALLANT, III, LUKE EDWARD GALLANT (RYAN, DANIEL)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN MICHELLE SCHWEIZER on behalf of EDWARD J GALLANT, III, LUKE EDWARD GALLANT (SCHWEIZER, CAROLYN)
December 30, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by HeavenSent Legal Services re: served Civil Complaint upon Luke Edward Gallant by Person in Charge on 12/11/2020 (SIMON, MARC)
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by HeavenSent Legal Services re: served Civil Complaint upon Edward Galant III by person in charge on 12/11/2020 (SIMON, MARC)
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW LOUIS BARON on behalf of CRAIG LYNCH (BARON, ANDREW)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CSE IS THE HONORABLE RICHARD A LLORET. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 11/17/20. 11/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
November 12, 2020 Summons Issued as to EDWARD J GALLANT, III, LUKE EDWARD GALLANT. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 11/12/2020 (bw, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14705614.), filed by CRAIG LYNCH.(SIMON, MARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LYNCH v. GALLANT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD J GALLANT, III
Represented By: CAROLYN MICHELLE SCHWEIZER
Represented By: DANIEL J. RYAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUKE EDWARD GALLANT
Represented By: CAROLYN MICHELLE SCHWEIZER
Represented By: DANIEL J. RYAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG LYNCH
Represented By: MARC I. SIMON
Represented By: ANDREW LOUIS BARON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?