EKO BRANDS, LLC v. JACENT STRATEGIC MERCHANDISING, LLC
Plaintiff: EKO BRANDS, LLC
Defendant: JACENT STRATEGIC MERCHANDISING, LLC and LAMI PRODUCTS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv05708
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT JACENT STRATEGIC MERCHANDISING, LLC IS GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 1/15/2021, TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/10/20. 12/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
December 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN C. GOLDBLUM on behalf of JACENT STRATEGIC MERCHANDISING, LLC with Certificate of Service(GOLDBLUM, STEPHEN)
December 8, 2020 Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by EKO BRANDS, LLC. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number 0313-14766159). (GORDON, ROBERT)
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EKO BRANDS, LLC re #7 Affidavit of Service, EKO BRANDS, LLC (GORDON, ROBERT)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Richard Scallon Jr. re: served Summons in a Civil Action upon Boris Berezhinsky of Jacent Strategic Merchandising LLC by Personal service on 12/03/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex. A - Affidavit of Process Server)(GORDON, ROBERT)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE LYNNE A SITARSKI. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 11/17/20. 11/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL; E-MAILED.(amas, )
November 17, 2020 DOC NO. 5 and 6 MAILED TO UNREP AND COUNSEL, ECF APP MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 11/17/2020. (kp, )
November 17, 2020 Summons Issued as to JACENT STRATEGIC MERCHANDISING, LLC. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 11/17/20 (amas, )
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF DAVID LOWE, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/16/20. 11/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP; NOT MAILED TO LOWE WITH ECF APPLICATION; E-MAILED.(amas, )
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 Report Of FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK by EKO BRANDS, LLC. (GORDON, ROBERT)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION/PETITION FOR ATTORNEY SEEKING TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO 83.5.2(B) by EKO BRANDS, LLC. (GORDON, ROBERT)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by EKO BRANDS, LLC.(GORDON, ROBERT)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT EKO BRANDS, LLC against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14714606.), filed by EKO BRANDS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet COVER SHEET TO PATENT COMPLAINT, #2 Declaration FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT FORM, #3 Designation Form DESIGNATION FORM)(GORDON, ROBERT)
November 16, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by EKO BRANDS, LLC. (md, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EKO BRANDS, LLC v. JACENT STRATEGIC MERCHANDISING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACENT STRATEGIC MERCHANDISING, LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. GOLDBLUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAMI PRODUCTS, LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN C. GOLDBLUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EKO BRANDS, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT GORDON
Represented By: DAVID ALLEN LOWE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?