STREAMLIGHT, INC. v. TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY
Plaintiff: STREAMLIGHT, INC.
Defendant: TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv05710
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF SETH R. OGDEN, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/13/21.1/13/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED. (fdc)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF RYAN D. LEVY, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/13/21.1/13/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 13, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Seth R. Ogden, Esquire filed by TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(APPELBAUM, ERIC)
January 13, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Ryan D. Levy, Esquire filed by TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(APPELBAUM, ERIC)
January 13, 2021 Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number 0313-14839797). (APPELBAUM, ERIC)
January 13, 2021 Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number 0313-14839768). (APPELBAUM, ERIC)
January 11, 2021 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including The Vanguard Group with Certificate of Service by TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY.(APPELBAUM, ERIC)
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 Defendant, Tractor Supply Company's ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM against STREAMLIGHT, INC. by TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY.(APPELBAUM, ERIC)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC JASON APPELBAUM on behalf of TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(APPELBAUM, ERIC)
December 29, 2020 COPY OF DOC. NO. 5 HAS BEEN MAILED TO UNREP PARTY, TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY. (bw, )
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT SHOULD BE EXTENDED TO 1/11/21; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/22/10. 12/22/10 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO UNREP.(JL )
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by STREAMLIGHT, INC.. (AQUILINA, JAMES)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, )
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STREAMLIGHT, INC..(AQUILINA, JAMES)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14714746.), filed by STREAMLIGHT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Designation Form)(AQUILINA, JAMES)
November 16, 2020 Summons Issued as to TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY. Forwarded To: James J. Aquilina, II on 11/16/20 (fdc, )
November 16, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STREAMLIGHT, INC.. (fb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STREAMLIGHT, INC. v. TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STREAMLIGHT, INC.
Represented By: JAMES J. AQUILINA, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACTOR SUPPLY COMPANY
Represented By: RYAN D. LEVY
Represented By: ERIC JASON APPELBAUM
Represented By: SETH R. OGDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?