MILLER v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE et al
Plaintiff: JOANNE MILLER
Defendant: Christopher Wasieczko and UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Case Number: 2:2020cv05771
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 11/25/2020. 11/25/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JOANNE MILLER (NEMEROFF, ROBERT)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (rf, )
November 19, 2020 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, Christopher Wasieczko, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 11/19/2020. SUMMONS ISSUED TO AUSA ON 11/19/2020. (bw, )
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christopher Wasieczko ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14722231.), filed by JOANNE MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(NEMEROFF, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLER v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wasieczko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANNE MILLER
Represented By: ROBERT H. NEMEROFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?