Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC
Plaintiff: Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC
Defendant: RICOH USA INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv05871
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Document #4 mailed to unrep party. (kw, )
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT RICOH MAY FILE ITS RESPONSIVE PLEADING ON OR BEFORE 2/4/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 12/11/20. 12/11/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
December 8, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC re: SEAN GLYNN served Summons and Complaint upon RICOH USA INC. by PERSONAL SERVICE. RICOH USA INC. served on 11/30/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (JL )
November 24, 2020 Summons Issued as to RICOH USA INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 11/24/2020 (bw, )
November 23, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. (md, )
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Midwest Youth A&S, Inc. by Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC.(BAZELON, RICHARD)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RICOH USA INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14733072.), filed by Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit 1-9, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 13, #9 Exhibit 14-17)(BAZELON, RICHARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Athletics and Sports Alliance LLC
Represented By: RICHARD L. BAZELON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICOH USA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?