JONES et al v. ROLLS-ROYCE CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER A. LORD, SHERI M. JONES and SEAN D. JONES
Defendant: HOWMET CASTINGS & SERVICES, INC., HOWMET AEROSPACE, INC., HOWMET ALUMINUM CASTING, INC., KEYSTONE TURBINE SERVICES, LLC, AVIALL SERVICES, INC., HOWMET CORPORATION, ROLLS-ROYCE CORPORATION and BOEING SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT SUPPORT, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv05891
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by LEE SCHMEER on behalf of ROLLS-ROYCE CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(SCHMEER, LEE)
January 22, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by J. DENNY SHUPE on behalf of ROLLS-ROYCE CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(SHUPE, J.)
January 22, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT J. WILLIAMS on behalf of ROLLS-ROYCE CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(WILLIAMS, ROBERT)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS ARE GRANTED LEAVE FOR LIMITED JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY INCLUDING UP TO TEN INTERROGATORIES AND TEN TAILORED DOCUMENT REQUESTS TO BE ANSWERED WITHIN 10 CALENDAR DAYS OF ISSUANCE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL AND THEREAFTER DEPOSE AN APPROPRIATE CUSTODIAN UNDER FRCP 30(b)(6) BY VIDEO SHARING TECHNOLOGY FOR NO MORE THAN 4 HOURS IF WARRANTED AS TO COMPLETE THIS LIMITED JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY NO LATER THAN 2/16/21. PLAINTIFFS ARE GRANTED LEAVE TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. 33) ON OR BEFORE 2/19/21, DEFENDANT MAY FILE A REPLY BY 2/24/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/19/21. 1/19/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
January 19, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . RESPONSES DUE BY 2/19/2021. REPLIES DUE BY 2/24/2021. (rf, )
January 15, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by HOWMET AEROSPACE, INC., HOWMET ALUMINUM CASTING, INC., HOWMET CASTINGS & SERVICES, INC., HOWMET CORPORATION.Memorandum, Certifcate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(BALLARD, ZACHARY)
January 15, 2021 Filing 32 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Howmet Corporation with Certificate of Service by HOWMET CASTINGS & SERVICES, INC..(BALLARD, ZACHARY)
January 15, 2021 Filing 31 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AVIALL SERVICES, INC.. (RICCI, WILLIAM)
January 15, 2021 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint by AVIALL SERVICES, INC..(RICCI, WILLIAM)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS HOWMET AEROSPACE, INC., HOWMET CORPORATION AND HOWMET ALUMINUM CASTING, INC ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE UNDER FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/13/21. 1/13/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
January 15, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint by BOEING SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT SUPPORT, LLC.(BRADLEY, PATRICK)
January 15, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SEAN D. JONES, SHERI M. JONES, CHRISTOPHER A. LORD As To Howmet Aerospace, Inc.; Howmet Corporation; and Howmet Aluminum Casting, Inc., ONLY(GAGLIANO, JOHN)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED AND M. ROSS CUNNINGHAM, ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/13/21. 1/14/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
January 13, 2021 Filing 25 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of M. Ross Cunningham by HOWMET AEROSPACE, INC., HOWMET ALUMINUM CASTING, INC., HOWMET CASTINGS & SERVICES, INC., HOWMET CORPORATION. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14841152.). (BALLARD, ZACHARY)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER THAT THE JOINT MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT AVIALL SERVICES, INC. IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANT AVIALL SERVICES, INC. MAY RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 1/15/21; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/6/21. 1/7/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
January 6, 2021 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer / Extend Deadlines and Agreed Stipulation of the Parties filed by AVIALL SERVICES, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RICCI, WILLIAM)
January 6, 2021 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Aviall, Inc. with Certificate of Service by AVIALL SERVICES, INC..(RICCI, WILLIAM)
January 6, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J. RICCI on behalf of AVIALL SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(RICCI, WILLIAM)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT JOINT MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANTS HOWMET AEROSPACE, INC., HOWMET CORPORATION, HOWMET CASTINGS & SERVICES, INC. AND HOWMET ALUMINUM CASTING, INC. MAY RESPOND TO COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 1/15/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 12/30/20. 12/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
December 30, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Attorney), filed by HOWMET AEROSPACE, INC., HOWMET ALUMINUM CASTING, INC., HOWMET CASTINGS & SERVICES, INC., HOWMET CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(BALLARD, ZACHARY)
December 29, 2020 Filing 18 Letter from the Deputy Clerk to the Honorable Mark A. Kearney to Timothy A. Loranger (rf, )
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT MOTION IS GRANTED AND TIMOTHY A. LORANGER IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 12/29/20. 12/29/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
December 29, 2020 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Timothy A. Loranger, Esq. filed by SEAN D. JONES, SHERI M. JONES, CHRISTOPHER A. LORD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John J. Gagliano, Esq., #2 Affidavit of Timothy A. Loranger, Esq., #3 Exhibit California Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing)(GAGLIANO, JOHN)
December 23, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by ZACHARY JOSEPH BALLARD on behalf of HOWMET AEROSPACE, INC., HOWMET ALUMINUM CASTING, INC., HOWMET CASTINGS & SERVICES, INC., HOWMET CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(BALLARD, ZACHARY)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT STIPULATION IS APPROVED IN PART AND DEFENDANT BOEING SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT SUPPORT, LLC MAY RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 1/15/21 AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 12/23/20. 12/23/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
December 23, 2020 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Sikorsky Support Services, Inc. and Boeing Aerospace Operations, Inc. by BOEING SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT SUPPORT, LLC.(BRADLEY, PATRICK)
December 23, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by BOEING SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT SUPPORT, LLC. (BRADLEY, PATRICK)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED THE NONCOMPLIANT MOTION OF TIMOTHY A. LORANGER, ESQUIRE (ECF DOC. NO. 10) TO PRACTICE UNDER LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO MOVE COMPLIANT WITH THIS COURT'S POLICIES AND PROCEDURES (NOVEMBER 2020). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 12/7/20.12/7/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
December 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Timothy A. Loranger, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14760280.) filed by SEAN D. JONES, SHERI M. JONES, CHRISTOPHER A. LORD..(GAGLIANO, JOHN)
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SEAN D. JONES re: Kevin Dunn served Summons and Complaint upon AVIALL SERVICES, INC. by Personal Service to Registered Agent. AVIALL SERVICES, INC. served on 12/3/2020, answer due 12/24/2020. (GAGLIANO, JOHN)
December 4, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SEAN D. JONES re: Kevin Dunn served Summons and Complaint upon BOEING SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT SUPPORT, LLC by Personal Service to Registered Agent. BOEING SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT SUPPORT, LLC served on 12/3/2020, answer due 12/24/2020. (GAGLIANO, JOHN)
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SEAN D. JONES re: Kevin Dunn served Summons and Complaint upon HOWMET ALUMINUM CASTING, INC. by Personal Service to Registered Agent. HOWMET ALUMINUM CASTING, INC. served on 12/3/2020, answer due 12/24/2020. (GAGLIANO, JOHN)
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SEAN D. JONES re: Kevin Dunn served Summons and Complaint upon HOWMET CASTINGS & SERVICES, INC. by Personal Service to Registered Agent. HOWMET CASTINGS & SERVICES, INC. served on 12/3/2020, answer due 12/24/2020. (GAGLIANO, JOHN)
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SEAN D. JONES re: Kevin Dunn served Summons and Complaint upon HOWMET CORPORATION by Personal Service to Registered Agent. HOWMET CORPORATION served on 12/3/2020, answer due 12/24/2020. (GAGLIANO, JOHN)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SEAN D. JONES re: Kevin Dunn served Summons and Complaint upon HOWMET AEROSPACE, INC. by Personal Service to Registered Agent. HOWMET AEROSPACE, INC. served on 12/3/2020, answer due 12/24/2020. (GAGLIANO, JOHN)
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SEAN D. JONES. KEYSTONE TURBINE SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 12/3/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (GAGLIANO, JOHN)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SEAN D. JONES. ROLLS-ROYCE CORPORATION waiver sent on 12/3/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (GAGLIANO, JOHN)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14734506.), filed by CHRISTOPHER A. LORD, SEAN D. JONES, SHERI M. JONES. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(GAGLIANO, JOHN) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/24/2020) (md, ). Modified on 11/24/2020 (md, ).
November 24, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SEAN D. JONES, SHERI M. JONES, CHRISTOPHER A. LORD. (md, )
November 24, 2020 Summons Issued as to AVIALL SERVICES, INC., BOEING SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT SUPPORT, LLC, HOWMET AEROSPACE, INC., HOWMET ALUMINUM CASTING, INC., HOWMET CASTINGS & SERVICES, INC., HOWMET CORPORATION, KEYSTONE TURBINE SERVICES, LLC, ROLLS-ROYCE CORPORATION. Forwarded To: JOHN JOSEPH GAGLIANO on 11/24/20 (fdc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES et al v. ROLLS-ROYCE CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER A. LORD
Represented By: JOHN JOSEPH GAGLIANO
Represented By: TIMOTHY A. LORANGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERI M. JONES
Represented By: JOHN JOSEPH GAGLIANO
Represented By: TIMOTHY A. LORANGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN D. JONES
Represented By: JOHN JOSEPH GAGLIANO
Represented By: TIMOTHY A. LORANGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWMET CASTINGS & SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: ZACHARY JOSEPH BALLARD
Represented By: M. ROSS CUNNINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWMET AEROSPACE, INC.
Represented By: ZACHARY JOSEPH BALLARD
Represented By: M. ROSS CUNNINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWMET ALUMINUM CASTING, INC.
Represented By: ZACHARY JOSEPH BALLARD
Represented By: M. ROSS CUNNINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEYSTONE TURBINE SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVIALL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM J. RICCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWMET CORPORATION
Represented By: ZACHARY JOSEPH BALLARD
Represented By: M. ROSS CUNNINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROLLS-ROYCE CORPORATION
Represented By: ROBERT J. WILLIAMS
Represented By: LEE SCHMEER
Represented By: J. DENNY SHUPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOEING SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT SUPPORT, LLC
Represented By: PATRICK BRADLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?