GADSON v. THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, METHODIST DIVISION
Plaintiff: NAEEMAH GADSON
Defendant: THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, METHODIST DIVISION
Case Number: 2:2020cv05976
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Disclosures by NAEEMAH GADSON.(COHEN, FAYE) Modified on 12/17/2020 (tjd).
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NAEEMAH GADSON. All Parties. (COHEN, FAYE)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THIS CASE IS THE HONORABLE RICHARD A. LLORET. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 12/4/20. 12/4/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 30, 2020 Summons Issued as to THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, METHODIST DIVISION. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 11/30/20 (amas, )
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, METHODIST DIVISION (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by NAEEMAH GADSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM)(amas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GADSON v. THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, METHODIST DIVISION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAEEMAH GADSON
Represented By: FAYE RIVA COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, METHODIST DIVISION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?