SSN HOTEL MANAGEMENT, LLC et al v. THE HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: SSN WILLIAMSPORT, LLC D/B/A RED ROOF INN WILLIAMSPORT, SSN CHRISTIANA, LLC D/B/A FOUR POINTS BY SHERATON, AKSHAR HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN-SWEDESBORO, SSN WEST ATLANTIC CITY, LLC D/B/A COMFORT INN WEST ATLANTIC INN, GHANSHYAM HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN LINDEN, SSN EWING, LLC D/B/A ELEMENT, SSN NEWARK AIRPORT, LLC D/B/A HOME2 NEWARK AIRPORT, SHREE HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN, SHRIJI HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A FAIRFIELD INN & SUITES, SSN HOTEL MANAGEMENT, LLC, SSN EGG HARBOR, LLC D/B/A DAYS HOTEL EGG HARBOR TWP, NILKANTH HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HOME2 HILTON KOP, SSN RUCHI NEWARK, LLC D/B/A CANDLEWOOD SUITES, SSN ABSECON, LLC D/B/A DAYS INN ABSECON, SHREE SWAMI NARAYAN, LLC D/B/A RED ROOF INN AND SUITES, SSN RUCHI SWEDESBORO, LLC D/B/A TOWNEPLACE SUITES SWEDESBORO, SAHAJ ANAND REHOBOTH HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A AMERICAN INN, SSN HERSHEY, LLC D/B/A INN AT CHOCOLATE AVENUE, SSN FORT BELVOIR, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN & SUITES, SSN RUCHI HOTEL LAND DEVELOPMENT, LLC D/B/A SPRING HILL SUITES, SAHAJ HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A RESIDENCE INN COLLEGEVILLE and SSN VOORHEES, LLC D/B/A HOLIDAY INN EXPRESS
Defendant: THE HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv06228
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Filing 8 Statement of Good Faith by AKSHAR HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN-SWEDESBORO, GHANSHYAM HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN LINDEN, NILKANTH HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HOME2 HILTON KOP, SAHAJ ANAND REHOBOTH HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A AMERICAN INN, SAHAJ HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A RESIDENCE INN COLLEGEVILLE, SHREE HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN, SHREE SWAMI NARAYAN, LLC D/B/A RED ROOF INN AND SUITES, SHRIJI HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A FAIRFIELD INN & SUITES, SSN ABSECON, LLC D/B/A DAYS INN ABSECON, SSN CHRISTIANA, LLC D/B/A FOUR POINTS BY SHERATON, SSN EGG HARBOR, LLC D/B/A DAYS HOTEL EGG HARBOR TWP, SSN EWING, LLC D/B/A ELEMENT, SSN FORT BELVOIR, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN & SUITES, SSN HERSHEY, LLC D/B/A INN AT CHOCOLATE AVENUE, SSN HOTEL MANAGEMENT, LLC, SSN NEWARK AIRPORT, LLC D/B/A HOME2 NEWARK AIRPORT, SSN RUCHI HOTEL LAND DEVELOPMENT, LLC D/B/A SPRING HILL SUITES, SSN RUCHI NEWARK, LLC D/B/A CANDLEWOOD SUITES, SSN RUCHI SWEDESBORO, LLC D/B/A TOWNEPLACE SUITES SWEDESBORO, SSN VOORHEES, LLC D/B/A HOLIDAY INN EXPRESS, SSN WEST ATLANTIC CITY, LLC D/B/A COMFORT INN WEST ATLANTIC INN, SSN WILLIAMSPORT, LLC D/B/A RED ROOF INN WILLIAMSPORT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PONSON, STANFORD)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL, NO LATER THAN 2/2/21, FILE A GOOD FAITH STATEMENT ON THE RECORD THAT NO PLAINTIFFS' MEMBERS ARE MARYLAND RESIDENTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 1/22/21. 1/22/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE TO HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/22/21. 1/22/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by GREGORY S. SPIZER on behalf of AKSHAR HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN-SWEDESBORO, GHANSHYAM HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN LINDEN, NILKANTH HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HOME2 HILTON KOP, SAHAJ ANAND REHOBOTH HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A AMERICAN INN, SAHAJ HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A RESIDENCE INN COLLEGEVILLE, SHREE HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN, SHREE SWAMI NARAYAN, LLC D/B/A RED ROOF INN AND SUITES, SHRIJI HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A FAIRFIELD INN & SUITES, SSN ABSECON, LLC D/B/A DAYS INN ABSECON, SSN CHRISTIANA, LLC D/B/A FOUR POINTS BY SHERATON, SSN EGG HARBOR, LLC D/B/A DAYS HOTEL EGG HARBOR TWP, SSN EWING, LLC D/B/A ELEMENT, SSN FORT BELVOIR, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN & SUITES, SSN HERSHEY, LLC D/B/A INN AT CHOCOLATE AVENUE, SSN HOTEL MANAGEMENT, LLC, SSN NEWARK AIRPORT, LLC D/B/A HOME2 NEWARK AIRPORT, SSN RUCHI HOTEL LAND DEVELOPMENT, LLC D/B/A SPRING HILL SUITES, SSN RUCHI NEWARK, LLC D/B/A CANDLEWOOD SUITES, SSN RUCHI SWEDESBORO, LLC D/B/A TOWNEPLACE SUITES SWEDESBORO, SSN VOORHEES, LLC D/B/A HOLIDAY INN EXPRESS, SSN WEST ATLANTIC CITY, LLC D/B/A COMFORT INN WEST ATLANTIC INN, SSN WILLIAMSPORT, LLC D/B/A RED ROOF INN WILLIAMSPORT(SPIZER, GREGORY)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NILKANTH HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HOME2 HILTON KOP, SSN RUCHI SWEDESBORO, LLC D/B/A TOWNEPLACE SUITES SWEDESBORO, SSN HERSHEY, LLC D/B/A INN AT CHOCOLATE AVENUE, SSN VOORHEES, LLC D/B/A HOLIDAY INN EXPRESS, SSN EWING, LLC D/B/A ELEMENT, SSN RUCHI NEWARK, LLC D/B/A CANDLEWOOD SUITES, SSN HOTEL MANAGEMENT, LLC, SSN FORT BELVOIR, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN & SUITES, SSN EGG HARBOR, LLC D/B/A DAYS HOTEL EGG HARBOR TWP, SHREE HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN, SSN ABSECON, LLC D/B/A DAYS INN ABSECON, SSN WEST ATLANTIC CITY, LLC D/B/A COMFORT INN WEST ATLANTIC INN, AKSHAR HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN-SWEDESBORO, SAHAJ HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A RESIDENCE INN COLLEGEVILLE, SSN RUCHI HOTEL LAND DEVELOPMENT, LLC D/B/A SPRING HILL SUITES, SHRIJI HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A FAIRFIELD INN & SUITES, SSN CHRISTIANA, LLC D/B/A FOUR POINTS BY SHERATON, SSN WILLIAMSPORT, LLC D/B/A RED ROOF INN WILLIAMSPORT, SAHAJ ANAND REHOBOTH HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A AMERICAN INN, GHANSHYAM HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN LINDEN, SSN NEWARK AIRPORT, LLC D/B/A HOME2 NEWARK AIRPORT, SHREE SWAMI NARAYAN, LLC D/B/A RED ROOF INN AND SUITES. THE HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 12/23/2020, answer due 2/22/2021. (SPIZER, GREGORY)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN C. MCNAMARA on behalf of THE HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MCNAMARA, KEVIN)
January 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by STANFORD B. PONSON on behalf of AKSHAR HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN-SWEDESBORO, GHANSHYAM HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN LINDEN, NILKANTH HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HOME2 HILTON KOP, SAHAJ ANAND REHOBOTH HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A AMERICAN INN, SAHAJ HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A RESIDENCE INN COLLEGEVILLE, SHREE HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN, SHREE SWAMI NARAYAN, LLC D/B/A RED ROOF INN AND SUITES, SHRIJI HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A FAIRFIELD INN & SUITES, SSN ABSECON, LLC D/B/A DAYS INN ABSECON, SSN CHRISTIANA, LLC D/B/A FOUR POINTS BY SHERATON, SSN EGG HARBOR, LLC D/B/A DAYS HOTEL EGG HARBOR TWP, SSN EWING, LLC D/B/A ELEMENT, SSN FORT BELVOIR, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN & SUITES, SSN HERSHEY, LLC D/B/A INN AT CHOCOLATE AVENUE, SSN HOTEL MANAGEMENT, LLC, SSN NEWARK AIRPORT, LLC D/B/A HOME2 NEWARK AIRPORT, SSN RUCHI HOTEL LAND DEVELOPMENT, LLC D/B/A SPRING HILL SUITES, SSN RUCHI NEWARK, LLC D/B/A CANDLEWOOD SUITES, SSN RUCHI SWEDESBORO, LLC D/B/A TOWNEPLACE SUITES SWEDESBORO, SSN VOORHEES, LLC D/B/A HOLIDAY INN EXPRESS, SSN WEST ATLANTIC CITY, LLC D/B/A COMFORT INN WEST ATLANTIC INN, SSN WILLIAMSPORT, LLC D/B/A RED ROOF INN WILLIAMSPORT (PONSON, STANFORD)
December 11, 2020 Summons Issued as to THE HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 12/11/2020 (bw, )
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14773518.), filed by NILKANTH HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HOME2 HILTON KOP, SSN RUCHI SWEDESBORO, LLC D/B/A TOWNEPLACE SUITES SWEDESBORO, SSN HERSHEY, LLC D/B/A INN AT CHOCOLATE AVENUE, SSN VOORHEES, LLC D/B/A HOLIDAY INN EXPRESS, SSN EWING, LLC D/B/A ELEMENT, SSN RUCHI NEWARK, LLC D/B/A CANDLEWOOD SUITES, SSN HOTEL MANAGEMENT, LLC, SSN FORT BELVOIR, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN & SUITES, SSN EGG HARBOR, LLC D/B/A DAYS HOTEL EGG HARBOR TWP, SHREE HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN, SSN ABSECON, LLC D/B/A DAYS INN ABSECON, SSN WEST ATLANTIC CITY, LLC D/B/A COMFORT INN WEST ATLANTIC INN, AKSHAR HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN-SWEDESBORO, SAHAJ HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A RESIDENCE INN COLLEGEVILLE, SSN RUCHI HOTEL LAND DEVELOPMENT, LLC D/B/A SPRING HILL SUITES, SHRIJI HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A FAIRFIELD INN & SUITES, SSN CHRISTIANA, LLC D/B/A FOUR POINTS BY SHERATON, SSN WILLIAMSPORT, LLC D/B/A RED ROOF INN WILLIAMSPORT, SAHAJ ANAND REHOBOTH HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A AMERICAN INN, GHANSHYAM HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN LINDEN, SSN NEWARK AIRPORT, LLC D/B/A HOME2 NEWARK AIRPORT, SHREE SWAMI NARAYAN, LLC D/B/A RED ROOF INN AND SUITES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit)(SPIZER, GREGORY)
December 10, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AKSHAR HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN-SWEDESBORO, GHANSHYAM HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN LINDEN, NILKANTH HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HOME2 HILTON KOP, SAHAJ ANAND REHOBOTH HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A AMERICAN INN, SAHAJ HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A RESIDENCE INN COLLEGEVILLE, SHREE HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN, SHREE SWAMI NARAYAN, LLC D/B/A RED ROOF INN AND SUITES, SHRIJI HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A FAIRFIELD INN & SUITES, SSN ABSECON, LLC D/B/A DAYS INN ABSECON, SSN CHRISTIANA, LLC D/B/A FOUR POINTS BY SHERATON, SSN EGG HARBOR, LLC D/B/A DAYS HOTEL EGG HARBOR TWP, SSN EWING, LLC D/B/A ELEMENT, SSN FORT BELVOIR, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN & SUITES, SSN HERSHEY, LLC D/B/A INN AT CHOCOLATE AVENUE, SSN HOTEL MANAGEMENT, LLC, SSN NEWARK AIRPORT, LLC D/B/A HOME2 NEWARK AIRPORT, SSN RUCHI HOTEL LAND DEVELOPMENT, LLC D/B/A SPRING HILL SUITES, SSN RUCHI NEWARK, LLC D/B/A CANDLEWOOD SUITES, SSN RUCHI SWEDESBORO, LLC D/B/A TOWNEPLACE SUITES SWEDESBORO, SSN VOORHEES, LLC D/B/A HOLIDAY INN EXPRESS, SSN WEST ATLANTIC CITY, LLC D/B/A COMFORT INN WEST ATLANTIC INN, SSN WILLIAMSPORT, LLC D/B/A RED ROOF INN WILLIAMSPORT. (JL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SSN HOTEL MANAGEMENT, LLC et al v. THE HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSN WILLIAMSPORT, LLC D/B/A RED ROOF INN WILLIAMSPORT
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: STANFORD B. PONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSN CHRISTIANA, LLC D/B/A FOUR POINTS BY SHERATON
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: STANFORD B. PONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AKSHAR HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN-SWEDESBORO
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: STANFORD B. PONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSN WEST ATLANTIC CITY, LLC D/B/A COMFORT INN WEST ATLANTIC INN
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: STANFORD B. PONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GHANSHYAM HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN LINDEN
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: STANFORD B. PONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSN EWING, LLC D/B/A ELEMENT
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: STANFORD B. PONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSN NEWARK AIRPORT, LLC D/B/A HOME2 NEWARK AIRPORT
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: STANFORD B. PONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHREE HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: STANFORD B. PONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHRIJI HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A FAIRFIELD INN & SUITES
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: STANFORD B. PONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSN HOTEL MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: STANFORD B. PONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSN EGG HARBOR, LLC D/B/A DAYS HOTEL EGG HARBOR TWP
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: STANFORD B. PONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NILKANTH HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A HOME2 HILTON KOP
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: STANFORD B. PONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSN RUCHI NEWARK, LLC D/B/A CANDLEWOOD SUITES
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: STANFORD B. PONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSN ABSECON, LLC D/B/A DAYS INN ABSECON
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: STANFORD B. PONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHREE SWAMI NARAYAN, LLC D/B/A RED ROOF INN AND SUITES
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: STANFORD B. PONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSN RUCHI SWEDESBORO, LLC D/B/A TOWNEPLACE SUITES SWEDESBORO
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: STANFORD B. PONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAHAJ ANAND REHOBOTH HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A AMERICAN INN
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: STANFORD B. PONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSN HERSHEY, LLC D/B/A INN AT CHOCOLATE AVENUE
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: STANFORD B. PONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSN FORT BELVOIR, LLC D/B/A HAMPTON INN & SUITES
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: STANFORD B. PONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSN RUCHI HOTEL LAND DEVELOPMENT, LLC D/B/A SPRING HILL SUITES
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: STANFORD B. PONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAHAJ HOSPITALITY, LLC D/B/A RESIDENCE INN COLLEGEVILLE
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: STANFORD B. PONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSN VOORHEES, LLC D/B/A HOLIDAY INN EXPRESS
Represented By: GREGORY S. SPIZER
Represented By: STANFORD B. PONSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HARFORD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: KEVIN C. MCNAMARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?