CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT v. JUUL LABS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT
Defendant: JUUL LABS, INC., JAMES MONSEES, JOHN DOES 1-100, HOYOUNG HUH, ADAM BOWEN, ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES LLC, ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY, RIAZ VALANI, NICHOLAS PRITZKER, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., PHILIP MORRIS USA, INC. and NU MARK, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv06475
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service Email)(SHUBER, JORDAN)
February 8, 2021 Filing 18 Praecipe to Reissue Summons by CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Amended Case Management Order No. 3 - MDL, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(SHUBER, JORDAN) Modified on 2/9/2021 (tjd).
February 8, 2021 Summons Issued as to ADAM BOWEN, ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES LLC, ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., HOYOUNG HUH, JAMES MONSEES, JUUL LABS, INC., NICHOLAS PRITZKER, NU MARK, LLC, PHILIP MORRIS USA, INC., RIAZ VALANI. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 2/8/21 (jaa, )
January 11, 2021 Original record transferred to the Northern District of California via Interdistrict transfer system. (MDL 2913, cto-54). (tjd)
January 8, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by JORDAN P. SHUBER on behalf of CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT (SHUBER, JORDAN)
January 7, 2021 Filing 16 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. 1/8/21 ENTERED. (kw, )
January 5, 2021 Filing 15 Praecipe to Issue Summons by CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(KING, THOMAS)
January 5, 2021 Summons Issued as to ADAM BOWEN, ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES LLC, ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., HOYOUNG HUH, JAMES MONSEES, JUUL LABS, INC., NICHOLAS PRITZKER, NU MARK, LLC, PHILIP MORRIS USA, INC., RIAZ VALANI. E-Mailed To: counsel on 1/5/21. (kw, )
December 29, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL I. LEVIN on behalf of CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT with Certificate of Service(LEVIN, MICHAEL)
December 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL T. SWEENEY on behalf of CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT with Certificate of Service(SWEENEY, MICHAEL)
December 23, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Riaz Valani on 12/23/2020 by CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT. Waiver of Service due by 1/22/2021. (KING, THOMAS)
December 23, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Philip Morris USA, Inc. on 12/23/2020 by CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT. Waiver of Service due by 1/22/2021. (KING, THOMAS)
December 23, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Nu Mark on 12/23/2020 by CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT. Waiver of Service due by 1/22/2021. (KING, THOMAS)
December 23, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Nicholas Pritzker on 12/23/2020 by CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT. Waiver of Service due by 1/22/2021. (KING, THOMAS)
December 23, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Juul Labs, Inc. on 12/23/2020 by CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT. Waiver of Service due by 1/22/2021. (KING, THOMAS)
December 23, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to James Monsees on 12/23/2020 by CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT. Waiver of Service due by 1/22/2021. (KING, THOMAS)
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Hoyoung Huh on 12/23/2020 by CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT. Waiver of Service due by 1/22/2021. (KING, THOMAS)
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Altria Group, Inc. on 12/23/2020 by CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT. Waiver of Service due by 1/22/2021. (KING, THOMAS)
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Altria Group Distribution Company on 12/23/2020 by CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT. Waiver of Service due by 1/22/2021. (KING, THOMAS)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Altria Client Services, Inc. on 12/23/2020 by CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT. Waiver of Service due by 1/22/2021. (KING, THOMAS)
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Adam Bowen on 12/23/2020 by CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT. Waiver of Service due by 1/22/2021. (KING, THOMAS)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(KING, THOMAS)
December 23, 2020 Filing Fee for COMPLAINT or NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Filing Fee $402, receipt number 0313-14802455). (KING, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT v. JUUL LABS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL LABS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES MONSEES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOYOUNG HUH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM BOWEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIAZ VALANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICHOLAS PRITZKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTRIA GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP MORRIS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NU MARK, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTENNIAL SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: THOMAS W. KING, III
Represented By: MICHAEL T. SWEENEY
Represented By: MICHAEL I. LEVIN
Represented By: JORDAN P. SHUBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?