GIANT FOOD STORES, LLC, N/K/A THE GIANT COMPANY LLC v. STOBBA ASSOCIATES, L.P.
Plaintiff: GIANT FOOD STORES, LLC, N/K/A THE GIANT COMPANY LLC
Defendant: STOBBA ASSOCIATES, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2020cv06480
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GIANT FOOD STORES, LLC, N/K/A THE GIANT COMPANY LLC. STOBBA ASSOCIATES, L.P. waiver sent on 2/16/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (WASKOM, THOMAS)
December 31, 2020 Summons Issued as to STOBBA ASSOCIATES, L.P.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 12/31/2020 (bw, )
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Ahold Delhaize USA; Koninklijke Ahold Delhaize, N.V. by GIANT FOOD STORES, LLC, N/K/A THE GIANT COMPANY LLC.(WASKOM, THOMAS)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STOBBA ASSOCIATES, L.P. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14802715.), filed by GIANT FOOD STORES, LLC, N/K/A THE GIANT COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet to the Complaint, #8 Case Management Track Form to the Complaint, #9 Designation Form to the Complaint, #10 Proposed Summons)(WASKOM, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GIANT FOOD STORES, LLC, N/K/A THE GIANT COMPANY LLC v. STOBBA ASSOCIATES, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GIANT FOOD STORES, LLC, N/K/A THE GIANT COMPANY LLC
Represented By: THOMAS R. WASKOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STOBBA ASSOCIATES, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?