PATEL v. WOLF et al
Plaintiff: VISHAL V PATEL
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL WILLIAM BARR, GREG RICHARDSON, ACTING DIR. USCI KEN CUCCINELLI, ACTING SECRETARY DHS CHAD WOLF, DIRECTOR TONY BRYSON, TONY BRYSON, CHAD WOLF, WILLIAM BARR and KEN CUCCINELLI
Case Number: 2:2020cv06529
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JAN E DUBOIS
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE ELIZABETH T. HEY.. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/7/2021. 1/7/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
January 5, 2021 Filing 2 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (sg, )
January 4, 2021 Summons Issued as to WILLIAM BARR, TONY BRYSON, KEN CUCCINELLI, GREG RICHARDSON, CHAD WOLF, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: EMAILED TO COUNSEL AND TO US ATTORNEY WITH ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE on 1/4/2021 (sg, )
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR MANDAMUS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14809398.), filed by VISHAL V PATEL. (Attachments: #1 Summons - WOLF, #2 Summons - BARR, #3 Summons- RICHARDSON, #4 Summons-CUCCINELLI, #5 Summons- BRYSON, #6 Exhibit l140 Approval, #7 Exhibit Receipt Vishal, #8 Exhibit Vishal Interview Notice, #9 Exhibit USCIS Processing Times, #10 Certificate of Service)(HOBBS, SHANE) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2021: #11 Civil Cover Sheet) (lisad, ). (Attachment 11 replaced on 1/4/2021) (lisad, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2021: #12 Designation Form) (lisad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PATEL v. WOLF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREG RICHARDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTING DIR. USCI KEN CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTING SECRETARY DHS CHAD WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTOR TONY BRYSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TONY BRYSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEN CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VISHAL V PATEL
Represented By: SHANE H. HOBBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?