FRANKEL v. KESSLER et al
Plaintiff: MARTIN FRANKEL
Defendant: HONORABLE JOHN D. KESSLER and MARIA H. GUZMAN
Case Number: 2:2021cv00093
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915; THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED; THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE FOR THE REASONS IN THE COURTS MEMORANDUM; THE MOTION FOR AN EMERGENCY TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER IS DENIED AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 1/21/21. 1/22/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 1/21/21. 1/22/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
January 12, 2021 PRO SE GUIDELINES MAILED TO PRO SE ON 1/12/2021 (kp, )
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for EMERGENCY Temporary Restraining Order filed by MARTIN FRANKEL.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(bw, )
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against MARIA H. GUZMAN, JOHN D. KESSLER, filed by MARTIN FRANKEL. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(Attachments: #1 COMPLAINT SIGNATURE PAGE, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit EMAIL)(bw, ) Modified on 1/8/2021 (bw, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2021: #4 Designation Form) (bw, ). (Attachment 4 replaced on 1/11/2021) (bw, ).
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by MARTIN FRANKEL.. (Attachments: #1 IFP 2, #2 IFP 3, #3 IFP 4, #4 IFP 5)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRANKEL v. KESSLER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONORABLE JOHN D. KESSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA H. GUZMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTIN FRANKEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?