PROGRESSIVE PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY v. HILDEBRANDT
Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: EDWARD HILDEBRANDT
Case Number: 2:2021cv00146
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Default Entered (mbh, )
February 19, 2021 DEFAULT BY EDWARD HILDEBRANDT FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (mbh, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Default PROGRESSIVE PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY against EDWARD HILDEBRANDT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit)(LEVAN, JENNIFER)
February 1, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PROGRESSIVE PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY re: Dean Myers served Summons and Complaint upon EDWARD HILDEBRANDT by Personal. EDWARD HILDEBRANDT served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021. (LEVAN, JENNIFER)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF CHRISTOPHER A. ABEL, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 1/26/21.1/26/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JEANNE E. NOONAN, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 1/26/21.1/26/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
January 14, 2021 Summons Issued as to EDWARD HILDEBRANDT. E-mailed to counsel on 1/14/21 (mbh, )
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against PROGRESSIVE PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14840955.), filed by PROGRESSIVE PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY.(LEVAN, JENNIFER) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2021: #1 Designation Form Corrected) (fb, ).
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including The Progressive Corporation by PROGRESSIVE PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY.(LEVAN, JENNIFER)
January 12, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by PROGRESSIVE PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY.(LEVAN, JENNIFER)
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER L. LEVAN on behalf of PROGRESSIVE PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY (LEVAN, JENNIFER)
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by PROGRESSIVE PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; INCORRECT CASE NUMBER). (LEVAN, JENNIFER) Modified on 1/13/2021 (fb)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by PROGRESSIVE PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; INCORRECT CASE NUMBER). (LEVAN, JENNIFER) Modified on 1/13/2021 (fb).
January 12, 2021 Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by PROGRESSIVE PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number 0313-14837661). (LEVAN, JENNIFER)
January 12, 2021 Filing Fee for PRO HAC VICE by PROGRESSIVE PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing Fee $40, receipt number 0313-14837653). (LEVAN, JENNIFER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PROGRESSIVE PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY v. HILDEBRANDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD HILDEBRANDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JENNIFER L. LEVAN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. ABEL
Represented By: JEANNE E. NOONAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?