Gondos v. LOWER BUCKS HOSPITAL
Plaintiff: Kimberly Gondos
Defendant: LOWER BUCKS HOSPITAL
Case Number: 2:2021cv00244
Filed: January 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 3/1/21. 3/1/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS TO ALLOW FOR BINDING ARBITRATION OF CLAIMS IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED. THIS ACTION IS STAYED UNTIL THE COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 2/2/21. 2/2/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, COPY TO ARB CLERK.(JL )
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kimberly Gondos. LOWER BUCKS HOSPITAL waiver sent on 1/29/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (CHASE, JONATHAN)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN L. SHAW on behalf of LOWER BUCKS HOSPITAL with Certificate of Service(SHAW, JONATHAN)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 2/9/21 AT 10:00 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 1/28/21. 1/28/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
January 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW J. HANK on behalf of LOWER BUCKS HOSPITAL with Certificate of Service(HANK, MATTHEW)
January 19, 2021 Summons Issued as to LOWER BUCKS HOSPITAL. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 1/19/21 (bw, )
January 18, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kimberly Gondos. (lisad, )
January 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LOWER BUCKS HOSPITAL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14849695.), filed by Kimberly Gondos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(CHASE, JONATHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gondos v. LOWER BUCKS HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Gondos
Represented By: JONATHAN W. CHASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOWER BUCKS HOSPITAL
Represented By: MATTHEW J. HANK
Represented By: JONATHAN L. SHAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?