Dantzler v. Monarch Recovery Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Maurice Dantzler
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive and Monarch Recovery Management, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00388
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ANITA B BRODY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Monarch Recovery Management, Inc..(METCHO, RONALD)
February 9, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Monarch Recovery Holdings, Inc. with Certificate of Service by Monarch Recovery Management, Inc..(METCHO, RONALD)
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Maurice Dantzler. Maurice Dantzler waiver sent on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (LEMBERG, SERGEI)
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD M. METCHO, II on behalf of Monarch Recovery Management, Inc. with Certificate of Service(METCHO, RONALD)
January 29, 2021 Summons Issued as to Monarch Recovery Management, Inc.. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 1/29/21 (amas, )
January 29, 2021 Case Eligible for Arbitration(lvj, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1-10, inclusive, Monarch Recovery Management, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14875214.), filed by Maurice Dantzler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(LEMBERG, SERGEI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dantzler v. Monarch Recovery Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monarch Recovery Management, Inc.
Represented By: RONALD M. METCHO, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Dantzler
Represented By: SERGEI LEMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?