CLAVIN v. BECK
Plaintiff: GERARD CLAVIN
Defendant: J. ROBERT BECK, JOHN R. BECK, JOHN ROBERT BECK and ROBERT BECK
Case Number: 2:2021cv00393
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dan Stein re: served Complaint upon J. Robert Beck by Special Service Processor on 02/08/2021 (SIMON, MARC)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by E. LAURENCE KATES on behalf of J. ROBERT BECK (KATES, E.)
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KANE DALY on behalf of GERARD CLAVIN (DALY, KANE)
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 2/3/2021. 2/3/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
January 29, 2021 Summons Issued as to J. ROBERT BECK AND EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL ON 1/29/21 (rf, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J. ROBERT BECK ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14875652.), filed by GERARD CLAVIN.(SIMON, MARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLAVIN v. BECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. ROBERT BECK
Represented By: E. LAURENCE KATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN R. BECK
Represented By: E. LAURENCE KATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN ROBERT BECK
Represented By: E. LAURENCE KATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT BECK
Represented By: E. LAURENCE KATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERARD CLAVIN
Represented By: MARC I. SIMON
Represented By: KANE DALY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?