WHALEY v. BYRNE et al
Petitioner: ANTHONY WHALEY
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF STATE PENNSYLVANIA: JOSH SHAPIRO and DAVID BYRNE
Case Number: 2:2021cv00394
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 SIGNED/RETURNED PETITION TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE by ANTHONY WHALEY. (jaa, )
March 9, 2021 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #5 WITH PETITION (#1) TO PETITIONER ON 3/9/21. (jaa, )
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION #4 TO EXTEND TIME IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND WHALEY A COPY OF HIS ORIGINAL PETITION ECF NO. #1 . IF WHALEY INTENDS TO PURSUE THIS MATTER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2254, HE SHALL COMPLETE THIS COURTS CURRENT STANDARD FORM, SIGN THE COMPLETED PETITION, AND RETURN IT TO THE CLERK OF COURT ON OR BEFORE APRIL 19, 2021. IF WHALEY FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 3/8/21. 3/8/21 ENTERED AND COPIES OF ORDER AND PETITION NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(jpd, )
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 Letter dated 2/28/2021 by ANTHONY WHALEY (sg, )
February 9, 2021 Copy of #3 Order and Blank form Petition 2254 mailed to Pro Se. (mas, )
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND WHALEY BLANK COPIES OF THIS COURTS CURRENT STANDARD FORM FOR FILING A PETITION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2254, BEARING THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. IF WHALEY INTENDS TO PURSUE THIS MATTER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2254, HE SHALL COMPLETE THIS COURTS CURRENT STANDARD FORM, SIGN THE COMPLETED PETITION, AND RETURN IT TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. IF WHALEY FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 2/3/21. 2/3/21 ENTERED AND COPIES OF ORDER AND FORMS NOT MAILED TO PRO SE..(jpd, )
February 3, 2021 PAPER #2 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL )
January 28, 2021 Filing Fee for HABEAS CORPUS by ANTHONY WHALEY. (Filing Fee $5,) (JL ) (RECEIPT #PPE223518)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.), filed by ANTHONY WHALEY. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHALEY v. BYRNE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ANTHONY WHALEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF STATE PENNSYLVANIA: JOSH SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DAVID BYRNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?