Baldwin Tower Office Building, LLC v. Grossinger NeuroPain Specialists, P.C.
Plaintiff: Baldwin Tower Office Building, LLC
Defendant: Grossinger NeuroPain Specialists, P.C.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00426
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B TUCKER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 First MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Grossinger NeuroPain Specialists, P.C... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit REQUEST FOR DEFAULT, #2 Exhibit AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, #3 Exhibit PROPOSED ORDER)(BALES, TODD)
March 1, 2021 DEFAULT BY Grossinger NeuroPain Specialists, P.C. FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (fdc, )
March 1, 2021 Default Entered. (fdc)
March 1, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Default Baldwin Tower Office Building, LLC against Grossinger NeuroPain Specialists, P.C.. (ZIMOLONG, WALTER)
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Martin A. Ettorre re: served Summons and Complaint upon Michelle Brandli by Substitute Service - Personal on 02/03/2021 (ZIMOLONG, WALTER)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE TIMOTHY R. RICE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 2/1/21. 2/2/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Grossinger NeuroPain Specialists, P.C. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14879821.), filed by Baldwin Tower Office Building, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit A - Grossinger Lease, #4 Exhibit B - Assignment and Assumption)(ZIMOLONG, WALTER)
January 29, 2021 Summons Issued as to Grossinger NeuroPain Specialists, P.C.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 1/29/21 (bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baldwin Tower Office Building, LLC v. Grossinger NeuroPain Specialists, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grossinger NeuroPain Specialists, P.C.
Represented By: TODD M. BALES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baldwin Tower Office Building, LLC
Represented By: WALTER STEPHEN ZIMOLONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?