UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TRAN
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: KIMBERLY TRAN and DUNG KIM TRAN
Case Number: 2:2021cv00730
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: BERLE M SCHILLER
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant Kimberly Tran filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emily K. Miller, #2 Exhibit A - Kimberly Tran SCRA, #3 Proposed Entry)(MILLER, EMILY)
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Andre Defrancesco re: served Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Designation Form upon Kimberly Tran a/k/a Dung Kim Tran by Personal/Individual on 03/23/2021 (MILLER, EMILY)
March 3, 2021 Summons Issued as to KIMBERLY TRAN. Forwarded To: EMILY KATHERINE MILLER on 3/3/21 (fdc, )
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT THE U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HON. DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 2/22/21. 2/22/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Federal Taxes against KIMBERLY TRAN, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(MILLER, EMILY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY TRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUNG KIM TRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: EMILY KATHERINE MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?