Holbrow v. MYLIFE.COM, INC.
Plaintiff: Mark Holbrow
Defendant: MYLIFE.COM, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00819
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT FOLLOWING A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ON DEFENDANTS LETTER REQUESTING A PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE (ECF NO. 6), AND PLAINTIFFS LETTER IN RESPONSE (ECF NO. 7), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, THE PARTIES SHALL MEET AND CONFER AND SUBMIT A JOINT UPDATE LETTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 4/1/2021. 4/1/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
April 1, 2021 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG Telephone PRE-MOTION Conference held on 4/1/2021 (sg, )
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED THAT A PRE-MOTION TELEPHONE CONFERENCE TO DISCUSS DEFENDANTS PROPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS IS SCHEDULED FOR 11:00 A.M. ON THURSDAY, APRIL 1, 2021. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 3/10/2021. 3/10/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
March 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Mark Holbrow re #6 Letter Reply letter to pre-motion filing (COTLAR, ANDREW)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 Letter dated March 3, 2021 by MYLIFE.COM, INC.. (RAND, JORDAN)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, )
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MYLIFE.COM, INC..(RAND, JORDAN)
February 24, 2021 Filing 3 EXHIBIT Designation Form by MYLIFE.COM, INC... (RAND, JORDAN)
February 24, 2021 Filing 2 EXHIBIT Civil Cover Sheet by MYLIFE.COM, INC... (RAND, JORDAN)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MYLIFE.COM, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14934881), filed by MYLIFE.COM, INC..(RAND, JORDAN)
February 23, 2021 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Defendant's counsel is directed to file the Civil Cover Sheet and Designation Form in this case using the Exhibit docket event. (lisad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holbrow v. MYLIFE.COM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Holbrow
Represented By: ANDREW D. COTLAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLIFE.COM, INC.
Represented By: JORDAN M. RAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?