NFIP, LLC et al v. NIFTY FIFTYS ALSO T/A NIFTY FIFTYS SODA FOUNTAIN et al
Plaintiff: THE HAMBURGER MUSEUM, INC., NFIP, LLC and NIFTY FIFTY'S FRANCHISNG, INC.
Defendant: JOHN DOES NOS. 1 THROUGH 5, OMAR SANTOS BRACAMONTES and NIFTY FIFTYS ALSO T/A NIFTY FIFTYS SODA FOUNTAIN
Case Number: 2:2021cv01300
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF SHAN LIAO, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/13/21.5/13/21 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(fdc)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF PHILIP P. MANN, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/13/21. 5/13/21 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(fdc)
May 12, 2021 Filing 11 Letter dated May 11, 2021 by NIFTY FIFTYS ALSO T/A NIFTY FIFTYS SODA FOUNTAIN. (GENOVESE, LAURA)
May 11, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Philip P. Mann of Philip P. Mann by NIFTY FIFTYS ALSO T/A NIFTY FIFTYS SODA FOUNTAIN. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-15113899.). (GENOVESE, LAURA)
May 11, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Shan Liao ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-15113881.) filed by NIFTY FIFTYS ALSO T/A NIFTY FIFTYS SODA FOUNTAIN.Certificate of Service.(GENOVESE, LAURA)
May 11, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Philip P. Mann filed by NIFTY FIFTYS ALSO T/A NIFTY FIFTYS SODA FOUNTAIN.Certificate of Service.(GENOVESE, LAURA)
April 21, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NFIP, LLC, NIFTY FIFTY'S FRANCHISNG, INC., THE HAMBURGER MUSEUM, INC. re: Greg Schermerhorn served Summons and Complaint upon OMAR SANTOS BRACAMONTES by served Omar Santos Bracamontes. OMAR SANTOS BRACAMONTES served on 4/1/2021, answer due 4/22/2021. (FRANK, ALAN)
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NFIP, LLC, NIFTY FIFTY'S FRANCHISNG, INC., THE HAMBURGER MUSEUM, INC. re: Greg Schermerhorn served Summons and Complaint upon NIFTY FIFTYS ALSO T/A NIFTY FIFTYS SODA FOUNTAIN by served Omar Santos Bracamontes. NIFTY FIFTYS ALSO T/A NIFTY FIFTYS SODA FOUNTAIN served on 4/1/2021, answer due 4/22/2021. (FRANK, ALAN)
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, )
March 19, 2021 Summons Issued as to OMAR SANTOS BRACAMONTES, NIFTY FIFTYS ALSO T/A NIFTY FIFTYS SODA FOUNTAIN. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 3/19/21 (bw, )
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by NIFTY FIFTY'S FRANCHISNG, INC..(FRANK, ALAN)
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by THE HAMBURGER MUSEUM, INC..(FRANK, ALAN)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by NFIP, LLC.(FRANK, ALAN)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OMAR SANTOS BRACAMONTES, JOHN DOES NOS. 1 THROUGH 5, NIFTY FIFTYS ALSO T/A NIFTY FIFTYS SODA FOUNTAIN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14990601.), filed by NFIP, LLC, NIFTY FIFTY'S FRANCHISNG, INC., THE HAMBURGER MUSEUM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(FRANK, ALAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NFIP, LLC et al v. NIFTY FIFTYS ALSO T/A NIFTY FIFTYS SODA FOUNTAIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES NOS. 1 THROUGH 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMAR SANTOS BRACAMONTES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIFTY FIFTYS ALSO T/A NIFTY FIFTYS SODA FOUNTAIN
Represented By: LAURA A. GENOVESE
Represented By: SHAN LIAO
Represented By: PHILIP P. MANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE HAMBURGER MUSEUM, INC.
Represented By: ALAN L. FRANK
Represented By: ROBERT B. FAMIGLIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NFIP, LLC
Represented By: ALAN L. FRANK
Represented By: ROBERT B. FAMIGLIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIFTY FIFTY'S FRANCHISNG, INC.
Represented By: ALAN L. FRANK
Represented By: ROBERT B. FAMIGLIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?