GRAHAM et al v. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Plaintiff: ANDRE DAVIS, WYKEEM BASS, ROLAND GRAHAM, CHARLES GREEN, ANTWON RICHARD, DOUG WEISER, FERNANDO MIRAYE, DURWARD ALLEN, NAFECE MARTIN and CESAR SAEZ
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Case Number: 2:2021cv01411
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Filing 10 Letter by ROLAND GRAHAM, ENVELOPE ATTACHED (rf, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 9 Letter by ROLAND GRAHAM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, ENVELOPE ATTACHED (rf, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by ROLAND GRAHAM *ENVELOPE ATTACHED*(rf, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by ROLAND GRAHAM, EXHIBIT, ENVELOPE ATTACHED (rf, )
May 3, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL, ENVELOPE ATTACHED filed by ROLAND GRAHAM..(rf, )
April 12, 2021 Document #5 mailed to pro se plff. (kw, )
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT GRAHAM'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO INCLUDE A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT SHOWING ALL DEPOSITS, WITHDRAWALS, ETC. TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE IN FORMA PAUPERIS, EACH PLFF MUST FILE HIS OWN MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS OWN PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT SHOWING ALL DEPOSITS, WITHDRAWALS, ETC. PLFF WILL BE GIVEN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO FILE THOSE DOCUMENTS WITH THE COURT. ALTERNATIVELY, THEY MAY PROCEED WITH THIS CASE IF THE CLERK OF COURT RECEIVES ONE PAYMENT OF $402 WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FURNISH EACH PLFF WITH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD PRISONER IN FORMA PAUPERIS FORM BEARING THE ABOVE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 4/9/21.4/9/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF AND BLANK COPY OF IFP FORMS NOT MAILED..(kw, )
March 29, 2021 MAILED OUT PRO SE GUIDELINES #4 TO PLAINTIFF ON 3/29/21. (jaa, )
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by ROLAND GRAHAM,.(bw, ) Modified on 4/8/2021 (nd, ).
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, filed by DURWARD ALLEN, CHARLES GREEN, DOUG WEISER, NAFECE MARTIN, CESAR SAEZ, ANDRE DAVIS, ROLAND GRAHAM, FERNANDO MIRAYE, WYKEEM BASS, ANTWON RICHARD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(bw, )
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ROLAND GRAHAM, ..(bw, ) Modified on 4/8/2021 (nd, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAHAM et al v. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRE DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WYKEEM BASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROLAND GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTWON RICHARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUG WEISER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FERNANDO MIRAYE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DURWARD ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAFECE MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CESAR SAEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?