STORMBORN TECHNOLOGIES LLC v. NETRONIX GROUP, INC.
Plaintiff: STORMBORN TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Defendant: NETRONIX GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01443
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD A MCHUGH
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME BY WHICH DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 6/17/21; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 5/17/21. 5/17/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 4/28/21. 4/28/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
April 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by BARRY L. COHEN on behalf of NETRONIX GROUP, INC., NETRONIX GROUP, INC. with Certificate of Service(COHEN, BARRY)
April 1, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STORMBORN TECHNOLOGIES LLC re: Beyond Process Service served Summons and Complaint upon NETRONIX GROUP, INC.. NETRONIX GROUP, INC. served on 3/30/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. (CHONG, JIMMY)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION OF HOWARD L. WERNOW ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 4/1/21.4/1/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO UNREP. (jaa, )
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Of Attorney Howard L. Wernow filed by STORMBORN TECHNOLOGIES LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(CHONG, JIMMY)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER #5 MAILED TO UNREP. (fdc)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) U.S. RE44, 199 E. (bw, )
March 30, 2021 Summons Issued as to NETRONIX GROUP, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 3/30/21 (bw, )
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STORMBORN TECHNOLOGIES LLC.(CHONG, JIMMY)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NETRONIX GROUP, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15012734.), filed by STORMBORN TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Designation Form, #6 Affidavit, #7 Affidavit)(CHONG, JIMMY)
March 26, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STORMBORN TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (tjd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STORMBORN TECHNOLOGIES LLC v. NETRONIX GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STORMBORN TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: JIMMY CHONG
Represented By: HOWARD L. WERNOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NETRONIX GROUP, INC.
Represented By: BARRY L. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?