THE HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY v. DELAWARE VALLEY AUTOMATION, LLC et al
Plaintiff: THE HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: ANDREW WARWICK, HOWARD WEITZNER, HARRY J. IRRGANG, JR., JOEL C. NACE, DELAWARE VALLEY AUTOMATION, LLC, ANDREW J. GILBERT, JOAO A. LEONARDO, ECOSAVE HOLDINGS, INC., JOHN A. CRANE, NICK DANIELS, JOHN K. CAREY, MICHAEL J. HAGGERTY, JR., ECOSAVE AUTOMATION, INC., MATTHEW DAVIS, LYLE J. GMOSER, CHRISTIAN SWEENEY, ECOSAVE, INC., MATTHEW DUGAN, ENERGY TRANSFER SOLUTIONS, LLC and WILLIAM VAN ESS, II
Case Number: 2:2021cv01525
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD A MCHUGH
Referring Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THE HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY. ECOSAVE, INC. waiver sent on 4/19/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. (JACOBS, CHRISTOPHER)
May 3, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THE HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY. ECOSAVE AUTOMATION, INC. waiver sent on 4/19/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. (JACOBS, CHRISTOPHER)
May 3, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THE HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY. ECOSAVE HOLDINGS, INC. waiver sent on 4/19/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. (JACOBS, CHRISTOPHER)
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MICHAEL J. HAGGERTY, JR, JOEL C. NACE, WILLIAM VAN ESS, II, JOAO A. LEONARDO, ANDREW J. GILBERT, MATTHEW DAVIS, ENERGY TRANSFER SOLUTIONS, LLC, JOHN A. CRANE, HARRY J. IRRGANG, JR, CHRISTIAN SWEENEY, MATTHEW DUGAN, JOHN K. CAREY, LYLE J. GMOSER, HOWARD WEITZNER, ANDREW WARWICK, NICK DANIELS, DELAWARE VALLEY AUTOMATION, LLC. MICHAEL J. HAGGERTY, JR waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021; JOEL C. NACE waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021; WILLIAM VAN ESS, II waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021; JOAO A. LEONARDO waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021; ANDREW J. GILBERT waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021; MATTHEW DAVIS waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021; ENERGY TRANSFER SOLUTIONS, LLC waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021; JOHN A. CRANE waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021; HARRY J. IRRGANG, JR waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021; CHRISTIAN SWEENEY waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021; MATTHEW DUGAN waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021; JOHN K. CAREY waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021; LYLE J. GMOSER waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021; HOWARD WEITZNER waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021; ANDREW WARWICK waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021; NICK DANIELS waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021; DELAWARE VALLEY AUTOMATION, LLC waiver sent on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (CASS, JONATHAN)
April 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CARL ENGEL on behalf of JOHN K. CAREY, JOHN A. CRANE, NICK DANIELS, MATTHEW DAVIS, DELAWARE VALLEY AUTOMATION, LLC, MATTHEW DUGAN, ENERGY TRANSFER SOLUTIONS, LLC, ANDREW J. GILBERT, LYLE J. GMOSER, MICHAEL J. HAGGERTY, JR, HARRY J. IRRGANG, JR, JOAO A. LEONARDO, JOEL C. NACE, CHRISTIAN SWEENEY, WILLIAM VAN ESS, II, ANDREW WARWICK, HOWARD WEITZNER with Certificate of Service(ENGEL, CARL)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN A. CASS on behalf of JOHN K. CAREY, JOHN A. CRANE, NICK DANIELS, MATTHEW DAVIS, DELAWARE VALLEY AUTOMATION, LLC, MATTHEW DUGAN, ENERGY TRANSFER SOLUTIONS, LLC, ANDREW J. GILBERT, LYLE J. GMOSER, MICHAEL J. HAGGERTY, JR, HARRY J. IRRGANG, JR, JOAO A. LEONARDO, JOEL C. NACE, CHRISTIAN SWEENEY, WILLIAM VAN ESS, II, ANDREW WARWICK, HOWARD WEITZNER with Certificate of Service(CASS, JONATHAN)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 4/6/21. 4/7/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
March 31, 2021 Summons Issued as to JOHN K. CAREY, JOHN A. CRANE, NICK DANIELS, MATTHEW DAVIS, DELAWARE VALLEY AUTOMATION, LLC, MATTHEW DUGAN, ECOSAVE AUTOMATION, INC., ECOSAVE HOLDINGS, INC., ECOSAVE, INC., ENERGY TRANSFER SOLUTIONS, LLC, ANDREW J. GILBERT, LYLE J. GMOSER, MICHAEL J. HAGGERTY, JR, HARRY J. IRRGANG, JR, JOAO A. LEONARDO, JOEL C. NACE, CHRISTIAN SWEENEY, WILLIAM VAN ESS, II, ANDREW WARWICK, HOWARD WEITZNER. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 3/31/21 (bw, )
March 31, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Opus Investment Management, Inc.; The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. by THE HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY.(JACOBS, CHRISTOPHER)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN K. CAREY, JOHN A. CRANE, NICK DANIELS, MATTHEW DAVIS, DELAWARE VALLEY AUTOMATION, LLC, MATTHEW DUGAN, ECOSAVE AUTOMATION, INC., ECOSAVE HOLDINGS, INC., ECOSAVE, INC., ENERGY TRANSFER SOLUTIONS, LLC, ANDREW J. GILBERT, LYLE J. GMOSER, MICHAEL J. HAGGERTY, JR, HARRY J. IRRGANG, JR, JOAO A. LEONARDO, JOEL C. NACE, CHRISTIAN SWEENEY, WILLIAM VAN ESS, II, ANDREW WARWICK, HOWARD WEITZNER ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15021993.), filed by THE HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Designation Form)(JACOBS, CHRISTOPHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY v. DELAWARE VALLEY AUTOMATION, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW WARWICK
Represented By: CARL ENGEL
Represented By: JONATHAN A. CASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD WEITZNER
Represented By: CARL ENGEL
Represented By: JONATHAN A. CASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRY J. IRRGANG, JR.
Represented By: CARL ENGEL
Represented By: JONATHAN A. CASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOEL C. NACE
Represented By: CARL ENGEL
Represented By: JONATHAN A. CASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELAWARE VALLEY AUTOMATION, LLC
Represented By: CARL ENGEL
Represented By: JONATHAN A. CASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW J. GILBERT
Represented By: CARL ENGEL
Represented By: JONATHAN A. CASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOAO A. LEONARDO
Represented By: CARL ENGEL
Represented By: JONATHAN A. CASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECOSAVE HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN A. CRANE
Represented By: CARL ENGEL
Represented By: JONATHAN A. CASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICK DANIELS
Represented By: CARL ENGEL
Represented By: JONATHAN A. CASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN K. CAREY
Represented By: CARL ENGEL
Represented By: JONATHAN A. CASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J. HAGGERTY, JR.
Represented By: CARL ENGEL
Represented By: JONATHAN A. CASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECOSAVE AUTOMATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW DAVIS
Represented By: CARL ENGEL
Represented By: JONATHAN A. CASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYLE J. GMOSER
Represented By: CARL ENGEL
Represented By: JONATHAN A. CASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTIAN SWEENEY
Represented By: CARL ENGEL
Represented By: JONATHAN A. CASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECOSAVE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW DUGAN
Represented By: CARL ENGEL
Represented By: JONATHAN A. CASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENERGY TRANSFER SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: CARL ENGEL
Represented By: JONATHAN A. CASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM VAN ESS, II
Represented By: CARL ENGEL
Represented By: JONATHAN A. CASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M. JACOBS
Represented By: HENRY M. SNEATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?