NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY v. BROAN-NUTONE, LLC
Plaintiff: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: BROAN-NUTONE, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01731
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26(f) MEETIGN AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/1/2021. 6/2/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2021: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement) (sfl, ).
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA MAY SUBMIT THE RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT FOR FILING IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 5/4/21. 5/6/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Plaintiff's Civil Cover, #2 Designation Form Pltf's Designation Form)(PAYNE, STEVEN)
April 18, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint together with with Defenses by BROAN-NUTONE, LLC.(HAFNER, ROBERT)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 EXHIBIT (Civil Cover Sheet and Designation Form with regular signatures) by BROAN-NUTONE, LLC.. (HAFNER, ROBERT)
April 14, 2021 Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Defendant's counsel is directed to file completed Civil Cover Sheet and Designation Form in this case using the Exhibit docket event. (md, )
April 13, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BROAN-NUTONE, LLC. (md, )
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including NORTEK, INC. by BROAN-NUTONE, LLC.(HAFNER, ROBERT)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BROAN-NUTONE, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15052186), filed by BROAN-NUTONE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A - Nationwide State Court Complaint)(HAFNER, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY v. BROAN-NUTONE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROAN-NUTONE, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: STEVEN JOSEPH PAYNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?