MICHAN-LEVY et al v. ABC CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC et al
Plaintiff: LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC and DR JOSE MICHAN-LEVY
Defendant: ABC CAPITAL BALTIMORE LLC, JAY WALSH, FLORENCIA MELENDEZ, STATESIDE APM, 477 MANAGEMENT LLC, ABC CAPITAL RE, YARON ZER, 477 INTERNATIONAL REALTY LLC, IPP USA LLC, AMIR VANA, ABC CAPITAL HOLDINGS LLC, ABC CAPITAL FINANCE LLC, ABC MANAGEMENT BALTIMORE LLC, NHS INVESTMENTS LLC, RICARDO SCATTOLINI, ABC CAPITAL MIAMI LLC, ABC CAPITAL RE LTD, ABC CAPITAL REALTY LLC, ABC CAPITAL INCOME FUND LLC, JOHN DOES 1-10, PHILLY METRO BUILDERS LLC, ABC CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC and NHS INVESTMENTS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01917
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT NHS INVESTMENT LLC, A PENNSYLVANIA LLC. IS HEREBY SUBSTITUTED FOR DEFENDANT NHS INVESTMENTS, LLC A TEXAS LLC AS IF ORIGINALLY SET FORTH IN PLAINTIFFS' CIVIL COMPLAINT. DEFENDANT NHS INVESTMENTS, LLC A TEXAS LLC IS DISIMISSED FROM THIS MATTER WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/17/21. 6/17/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
June 17, 2021 Filing 27 STIPULATION and Agreement Regarding Substitution of the Correct "NHS Investments, LLC" by LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC, JOSE MICHAN-LEVY. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW)
June 11, 2021 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY. ABC CAPITAL FINANCE LLC waiver sent on 6/3/2021, answer due 8/2/2021; ABC CAPITAL HOLDINGS LLC waiver sent on 6/3/2021, answer due 8/2/2021; ABC CAPITAL INCOME FUND LLC waiver sent on 6/3/2021, answer due 8/2/2021; ABC CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC waiver sent on 6/3/2021, answer due 8/2/2021; ABC CAPITAL RE waiver sent on 6/3/2021, answer due 8/2/2021; ABC CAPITAL RE LTD waiver sent on 6/3/2021, answer due 8/2/2021; ABC CAPITAL REALTY LLC waiver sent on 6/3/2021, answer due 8/2/2021; IPP USA LLC waiver sent on 6/3/2021, answer due 8/2/2021; PHILLY METRO BUILDERS LLC waiver sent on 6/3/2021, answer due 8/2/2021; AMIR VANA waiver sent on 6/3/2021, answer due 8/2/2021; JAY WALSH waiver sent on 6/3/2021, answer due 8/2/2021; YARON ZER waiver sent on 6/3/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (WEISBERG, MATTHEW)
June 5, 2021 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC served Summons and Complaint upon RICARDO SCATTOLINI by Certified Mail. RICARDO SCATTOLINI served on 5/18/2021, answer due 6/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 5, 2021 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC served Summons and Complaint upon FLORENCIA MELENDEZ by Certified Mail. FLORENCIA MELENDEZ served on 5/18/2021, answer due 6/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 5, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC served Summons and Complaint upon ABC CAPITAL MIAMI LLC by Certified Mail. ABC CAPITAL MIAMI LLC served on 5/18/2021, answer due 6/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 5, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC served Summons and Complaint upon 477 MANAGEMENT LLC by Certified Mail. 477 MANAGEMENT LLC served on 5/18/2021, answer due 6/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 5, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC served Summons and Complaint upon 477 INTERNATIONAL REALTY LLC by Certified Mail. 477 INTERNATIONAL REALTY LLC served on 5/18/2021, answer due 6/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 2, 2021 Filing 20 Summons Returned Unexecuted by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC as to YARON ZER. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 2, 2021 Filing 19 Summons Returned Unexecuted by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC as to PHILLY METRO BUILDERS LLC. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 2, 2021 Filing 18 Summons Returned Unexecuted by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC as to JAY WALSH. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 2, 2021 Filing 17 Summons Returned Unexecuted by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC as to IPP USA LLC. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 2, 2021 Filing 16 Summons Returned Unexecuted by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC as to ABC CAPITAL REALTY LLC. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 2, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Returned Unexecuted by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC as to ABC CAPITAL RE. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 2, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC as to ABC CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 2, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC as to ABC CAPITAL INCOME FUND LLC. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 2, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC as to ABC CAPITAL HOLDINGS LLC. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 2, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC as to ABC CAPITAL FINANCE LLC. (SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 2, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC served Summons and Complaint upon RICARDO SCATTOLINI by Certified Mail. RICARDO SCATTOLINI served on (NO DATE SHOWN ON CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SCHAFKOPF, GARY) Modified on 6/3/2021 (fb).
June 2, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC served Summons and Complaint upon NHS INVESTMENTS LLC by Certified Mail. NHS INVESTMENTS LLC served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 2, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC served Summons and Complaint upon FLORENCIA MELENDEZ by Certified Mail. FLORENCIA MELENDEZ served on (NO DATE SHOWN ON CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SCHAFKOPF, GARY) Modified on 6/3/2021 (fb).
June 2, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC served Summons and Complaint upon ABC CAPITAL MIAMI LLC by Certified Mail. ABC CAPITAL MIAMI LLC served on (NO DATE SHOWN ON CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SCHAFKOPF, GARY) Modified on 6/3/2021 (fb).
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC served Summons and Complaint upon ABC MANAGEMENT BALTIMORE LLC by Certified Mail. ABC MANAGEMENT BALTIMORE LLC served on 5/18/2021, answer due 6/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC served Summons and Complaint upon 477 MANAGEMENT LLC by Certified Mail. 477 MANAGEMENT LLC served on (NO DATE SHOWN ON CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SCHAFKOPF, GARY) Modified on 6/3/2021 (fb).
June 2, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC served Summons and Complaint upon 477 INTERNATIONAL REALTY LLC by Certified Mail. 477 INTERNATIONAL REALTY LLC served on (NO DATE SHOWN ON CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SCHAFKOPF, GARY) Modified on 6/3/2021 (fb).
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC served Summons and Complaint upon STATESIDE APM by Certified Mail. STATESIDE APM served on 5/17/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SCHAFKOPF, GARY)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by L. ANTHONY DIJIACOMO, III on behalf of LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC, JOSE MICHAN-LEVY with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(DIJIACOMO, L.)
April 27, 2021 Summons Issued as to 477 INTERNATIONAL REALTY LLC, 477 MANAGEMENT LLC, ABC CAPITAL BALTIMORE LLC, ABC CAPITAL FINANCE LLC, ABC CAPITAL HOLDINGS LLC, ABC CAPITAL INCOME FUND LLC, ABC CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC, ABC CAPITAL MIAMI LLC, ABC CAPITAL RE, ABC CAPITAL RE LTD, ABC CAPITAL REALTY LLC, ABC MANAGEMENT BALTIMORE LLC, IPP USA LLC, FLORENCIA MELENDEZ, NHS INVESTMENTS LLC, PHILLY METRO BUILDERS LLC, RICARDO SCATTOLINI, STATESIDE APM, AMIR VANA, JAY WALSH, YARON ZER AND EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL (rf, )
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 477 INTERNATIONAL REALTY LLC, 477 MANAGEMENT LLC, ABC CAPITAL BALTIMORE LLC, ABC CAPITAL FINANCE LLC, ABC CAPITAL HOLDINGS LLC, ABC CAPITAL INCOME FUND LLC, ABC CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC, ABC CAPITAL MIAMI LLC, ABC CAPITAL RE, ABC CAPITAL RE LTD, ABC CAPITAL REALTY LLC, ABC MANAGEMENT BALTIMORE LLC, JOHN DOES 1-10, IPP USA LLC, FLORENCIA MELENDEZ, NHS INVESTMENTS LLC, PHILLY METRO BUILDERS LLC, RICARDO SCATTOLINI, STATESIDE APM, AMIR VANA, JAY WALSH, YARON ZER ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15079458.), filed by JOSE MICHAN-LEVY, LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit)(SCHAFKOPF, GARY) Modified on 4/26/2021 (fb).
April 26, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC, JOSE MICHAN-LEVY. (fb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MICHAN-LEVY et al v. ABC CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CAPITAL BALTIMORE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORENCIA MELENDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATESIDE APM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 477 MANAGEMENT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CAPITAL RE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YARON ZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 477 INTERNATIONAL REALTY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPP USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMIR VANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CAPITAL HOLDINGS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CAPITAL FINANCE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC MANAGEMENT BALTIMORE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHS INVESTMENTS LLC
Represented By: KELLY E. KLEIST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICARDO SCATTOLINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CAPITAL MIAMI LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CAPITAL RE LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CAPITAL REALTY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CAPITAL INCOME FUND LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLY METRO BUILDERS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHS INVESTMENTS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIFELIGHT GROUP LLC
Represented By: GARY SCHAFKOPF
Represented By: MATTHEW B. WEISBERG
Represented By: L. ANTHONY DIJIACOMO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DR JOSE MICHAN-LEVY
Represented By: GARY SCHAFKOPF
Represented By: MATTHEW B. WEISBERG
Represented By: L. ANTHONY DIJIACOMO, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?