Ladouceur v. Pleasant Valley Manor, Inc.
Plaintiff: Etna Ladouceur
Defendant: Pleasant Valley Manor, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01993
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 21, 2021 SHALL BE HELD ON AUGUST 2, 2021 AT 2:00 P.M. IN ROOM 14614, UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106. PLAINTIFF AND A REPRESENTATIVE OF DEFENDANT WITH FULL AUTHORITY TO SETTLE THE CASE (IN ADDITION TO COUNSEL) SHALL ATTEND; AND 2. THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 26(F) REPORT UPDATING THEIR STATUS WITH DISCOVERY AND IN SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS NO LATER THAN JULY 27, 2021.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/22/2021. 6/22/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PARTIES' CLAW BACK STIPULATION (EXH. A), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES' STIPULATION EXH. A) IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) 6/22/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
June 18, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pleasant Valley Manor, Inc. filed by Etna Ladouceur.(MURTHY, ANGELI) Modified on 6/22/2021 (tjd).
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/3/2021 10:00 AM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND. DISCOVERY DUE BY 8/5/2021. MOTIONS DUE BY 8/19/2021. MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 10/19/2021. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 8/19/2021. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 10/19/2021. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 10/19/2021. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 11/9/2021 09:30 AM IN Courtroom 14A BEFORE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/4/21. 6/7/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
June 4, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/21/2021 02:00 PM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND. (jaa, )
May 28, 2021 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by Pleasant Valley Manor, Inc..(LITVIN, CAREN)
May 28, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Pleasant Valley Manor, Inc..(LITVIN, CAREN)
May 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CAREN LITVIN on behalf of Pleasant Valley Manor, Inc. with Certificate of Service(LITVIN, CAREN)
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Alan Focht re: served Summons, Complaint, Case Management Track, and Designation Form upon Lynne Ahner by Process Server on 05/07/2021, answer due 05/28/2021. (MURTHY, ANGELI) Modified on 5/16/2021 (tjd).
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Etna Ladouceur re #2 Order of Compliance (MURTHY, ANGELI)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 5/6/2021. 5/6/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
May 3, 2021 Summons Issued as to Pleasant Valley Manor, Inc.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 5/3/21 (bw, )
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Pleasant Valley Manor, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15089045.), filed by Etna Ladouceur. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A"- Letter dated May 4, 2020 from Defendant, #2 Exhibit "B"- Copy of Tracking Information, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Case Management Track Form, #5 Designation Form)(MURTHY, ANGELI)
April 30, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Etna Ladouceur. (JL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ladouceur v. Pleasant Valley Manor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pleasant Valley Manor, Inc.
Represented By: CAREN LITVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Etna Ladouceur
Represented By: ANGELI MURTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?