WILMORE v. ADDISON GROUP et al
Plaintiff: VANESIA WILMORE
Defendant: SAYRE HEALTH CENTER and ADDISON GROUP
Case Number: 2:2021cv02074
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ADDISON GROUP SHALL HAVE UP TO AND INCLUDING 7/13/21 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/23/21. 6/23/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
June 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID L. HACKETT on behalf of ADDISON GROUP with Certificate of Service(HACKETT, DAVID)
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by VANESIA WILMORE As To DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS AGAINST SAYRE HEALTH CENTER(SHIKUNOV, ERICA)
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA MURPHY WEBER on behalf of SAYRE HEALTH CENTER with Certificate of Service(WEBER, MELISSA)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT ADDISON GROUP'S RESPONSIVE PLEADING IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/22/21. 6/22/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO UNREP.(JL )
June 22, 2021 COPY OF DOC. NO. 5 HAS BEEN MAILED TO UNREP. PARTY. (bw, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by KARLA LYNN JOHNSON on behalf of ADDISON GROUP (JOHNSON, KARLA)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VANESIA WILMORE re: Tom Fredericks served Summons and Complaint upon ADDISON GROUP, SAYRE HEALTH CENTER by Hand Delivery. ADDISON GROUP served on 6/1/2021, answer due 6/22/2021; SAYRE HEALTH CENTER served on 6/1/2021, answer due 6/22/2021. (SHIKUNOV, ERICA)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE RICHARD A. LLORET; ETC.. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/21/21. 5/21/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADDISON GROUP, SAYRE HEALTH CENTER ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15101066.), filed by VANESIA WILMORE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(SHIKUNOV, ERICA)
May 5, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by VANESIA WILMORE. (fb)
May 5, 2021 Summons Issued as to ADDISON GROUP, SAYRE HEALTH CENTER. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 5/5/21 (bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILMORE v. ADDISON GROUP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VANESIA WILMORE
Represented By: ERICA A. SHIKUNOV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAYRE HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: MELISSA MURPHY WEBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADDISON GROUP
Represented By: KARLA LYNN JOHNSON
Represented By: DAVID L. HACKETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?