YEHUDAH v. UNIVERSITY CITY HOUSING et al
Plaintiff: SHAMARIAH YEHUDAH
Defendant: LESLIE SMILIE UNIVERSITY CITY HOUSING COMPANT D/B/A RIVERSIDE APARTMENTS, UNIVERSITY CITY HOUSING doing business as RIVERSIDE APARTMENTS and UNIVERSITY CITY HOUSING COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2021cv02245
Filed: May 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD A MCHUGH
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PRO SE PLFF SHAMARIAH YEHUDAH, re: U.S. Marshal served Summons and Complaint upon DEFT UNIVERSITY CITY HOUSING by personal service on 6/30/2021, answer due 7/21/2021. (kw, ) Modified on 7/2/2021 (tjd).
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by EAMON C. MERRIGAN on behalf of LESLIE SMILIE, UNIVERSITY CITY HOUSING, UNIVERSITY CITY HOUSING COMPANY with Jury Demand(MERRIGAN, EAMON)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. SERVICE OF THE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT SHALL BE MADE UPON DEFTS BY THE U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. YEHUDAH WILL BE REQUIRED TO COMPLETE USM-285 FORMS SO THAT THE MARSHALS CAN SERVE THE DEFT. FAILURE TO COMPLETE THOSE FORMS MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS CASE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 5/27/21.5/27/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
May 27, 2021 Summons Issued as to LESLIE SMILIE, UNIVERSITY CITY HOUSING, UNIVERSITY CITY HOUSING COMPANY. E-Mailed To: U.S. Marshal on 5/27/21. (kw, )
May 15, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
May 15, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against LESLIE SMILIE, UNIVERSITY CITY HOUSING, UNIVERSITY CITY HOUSING COMPANY, filed by SHAMARIAH YEHUDAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 E-MAIL)(bw, )
May 15, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by SHAMARIAH YEHUDAH..(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YEHUDAH v. UNIVERSITY CITY HOUSING et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAMARIAH YEHUDAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LESLIE SMILIE UNIVERSITY CITY HOUSING COMPANT D/B/A RIVERSIDE APARTMENTS
Represented By: EAMON C. MERRIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY CITY HOUSING doing business as RIVERSIDE APARTMENTS
Represented By: EAMON C. MERRIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY CITY HOUSING COMPANY
Represented By: EAMON C. MERRIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?