LAZER & LAZER v. AGRONOMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC et al
Plaintiff: LAZER & LAZER and LAZER & LAZER CORPORATION doing business as LAZER CAPITAL
Defendant: AGRI-KIND, LLC, AGRONOMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, AGRONOMED BIOLOGICS LLC and AGRONOMED HOLDINGS INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02253
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: BERLE M SCHILLER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR TUESDAY 7/27/2021 AT 9:30 AM VIA TELEPHONE BEFORE THE HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER; CALL-IN NUMBER IS 888-684-8852 (ACCESS CODE: 9715761#). IT IS EXPECTED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL HAVE CONDUCTED SUBSTANTIAL DISCOVERY BY THE TIME OF THE RULE 16 CONFERENCE. ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED (jp, )
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION OF DAVID FEUERSTEIN ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 6/28/21. 6/28/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION OF RICHARD WALKER TROTTER ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 6/28/21. 6/28/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Richard Walker Trotter ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-15209044.) filed by AGRI-KIND, LLC, AGRONOMED BIOLOGICS LLC, AGRONOMED HOLDINGS INC., AGRONOMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC.Certificate of Service.(EBBY, ROBERT)
June 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of David Todd Feuerstein ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-15209016.) filed by AGRI-KIND, LLC, AGRONOMED BIOLOGICS LLC, AGRONOMED HOLDINGS INC., AGRONOMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC.Certificate of Service.(EBBY, ROBERT)
June 18, 2021 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by AGRI-KIND, LLC.(EBBY, ROBERT)
June 18, 2021 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by AGRONOMED BIOLOGICS LLC.(EBBY, ROBERT)
June 18, 2021 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by AGRONOMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC.(EBBY, ROBERT)
June 18, 2021 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by AGRONOMED HOLDINGS INC..(EBBY, ROBERT)
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by AGRI-KIND, LLC, AGRONOMED BIOLOGICS LLC, AGRONOMED HOLDINGS INC., AGRONOMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC. Affirmative Defenses.(EBBY, ROBERT) Modified on 6/22/2021 (tjd).
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE ELIZABETH T. HEY. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/24/21. 5/24/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
May 19, 2021 Summons Issued as to AGRI-KIND, LLC, AGRONOMED BIOLOGICS LLC, AGRONOMED HOLDINGS INC., AGRONOMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 5/19/21 (bw, )
May 17, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by LAZER & LAZER. (JL )
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by LAZER & LAZER CORPORATION.(BURKLEY, KIRK) Modified on 5/18/2021 (tjd).
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Agronomed Pharmaceuticals LLC, Agronomed Holdings Inc., Agronomed Biologics LLC, and Agri-Kind LLC against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15128115.), filed by LAZER & LAZER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(BURKLEY, KIRK) Modified on 5/18/2021 (tjd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAZER & LAZER v. AGRONOMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAZER & LAZER
Represented By: KIRK BURKLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAZER & LAZER CORPORATION doing business as LAZER CAPITAL
Represented By: KIRK BURKLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGRI-KIND, LLC
Represented By: DAVID FEUERSTEIN
Represented By: RICHARD WALKER TROTTER
Represented By: ROBERT L. EBBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGRONOMED PHARMACEUTICALS LLC
Represented By: DAVID FEUERSTEIN
Represented By: RICHARD WALKER TROTTER
Represented By: ROBERT L. EBBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGRONOMED BIOLOGICS LLC
Represented By: DAVID FEUERSTEIN
Represented By: RICHARD WALKER TROTTER
Represented By: ROBERT L. EBBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGRONOMED HOLDINGS INC.
Represented By: DAVID FEUERSTEIN
Represented By: RICHARD WALKER TROTTER
Represented By: ROBERT L. EBBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?