DEARRY et al v. SOAREN MANAGEMENT, LLC et al
Plaintiff: PENNY GREEN and IDELL DEARRY
Defendant: JOSHUA BICKERSTAFF, ANDREW DUNN, FACTORTRUST, INC., SOAREN MANAGEMENT, LLC, KRAKEN HOLDINGS, LLC and JOHN DOE DEBT COLLECTORS
Case Number: 2:2021cv02548
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE RE: SERVICE, FILED BY IDELL DEARRY, PENNY GREEN. (amas, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by IDELL DEARRY, PENNY GREEN. JOSHUA BICKERSTAFF waiver sent on 7/23/2021, answer due 9/21/2021; ANDREW DUNN waiver sent on 7/23/2021, answer due 9/21/2021; KRAKEN HOLDINGS, LLC waiver sent on 7/23/2021, answer due 9/21/2021. (ACKELSBERG, IRV)
July 21, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER TO MR. ACKELSBERG; FROM ULRIKE HEVENER (DEPUTY TO JUDGE KEARNEY); DATED 7/21/21; RE: DEFAULT. (amas, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by SAMANTHA L. SOUTHALL on behalf of FACTORTRUST, INC. with Certificate of Service(SOUTHALL, SAMANTHA)
July 15, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by IDELL DEARRY, PENNY GREEN. FACTORTRUST, INC. waiver sent on 7/12/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (ACKELSBERG, IRV)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 Letter dated 7/6/21 FROM ULRIKE HEVENER TO IRV ACKELSBERG (JL)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Cheryl Anderson re: served Summons and Complaint on Defendant Kraken Holdings, LLC upon Kevin Jackson, HR Manager, Kraken Holdings LLC by personal on 6/22/2021 (ACKELSBERG, IRV)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Cheryl Anderson re: served Summons and Complaint on Defendant Joshua Bickerstaff upon Steve Letak, CFO of Soaren Management LLC by personal, at place of business on 6/10/2021 (ACKELSBERG, IRV)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Cheryl Anderson re: served Summons and Complaint on Defendant Andrew Dunn upon Steve Letak, CFO of Soaren Management LLC by personal, at place of business on 6/10/2021 (ACKELSBERG, IRV)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Cheryl Anderson re: served Summons and Complaint on Defendant Soaren Management LLC upon Steve Letak, CFO of Soaren Management LLC by Personal on 6/10/2021 (ACKELSBERG, IRV)
June 7, 2021 Summons Issued as to JOSHUA BICKERSTAFF, ANDREW DUNN, FACTORTRUST, INC., JOHN DOE DEBT COLLECTORS, KRAKEN HOLDINGS, LLC, SOAREN MANAGEMENT, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 6/7/21 (bw, )
June 4, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by IDELL DEARRY. (JL )
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15168955.), filed by IDELL DEARRY, PENNY GREEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(ACKELSBERG, IRV) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/8/2021) (amas, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEARRY et al v. SOAREN MANAGEMENT, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA BICKERSTAFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW DUNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FACTORTRUST, INC.
Represented By: SAMANTHA L. SOUTHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOAREN MANAGEMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRAKEN HOLDINGS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE DEBT COLLECTORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENNY GREEN
Represented By: IRV ACKELSBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IDELL DEARRY
Represented By: IRV ACKELSBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?