DUDASH v. CAIRN UNIVERSITY et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH F. DUDASH
Defendant: MARY W. BOYER, CAIRN UNIVERSITY and CHRISTOPHER LLOYD
Case Number: 2:2021cv02691
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT TIME FOR DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IS DUE 8/23/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/3/21. 8/3/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by MARY W. BOYER, CAIRN UNIVERSITY, CHRISTOPHER LLOYD. (RIDENOUR, MICHAEL)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT EXTENDED TO 8/9/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/7/21. 7/8/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 7, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by MARY W. BOYER, CAIRN UNIVERSITY, CHRISTOPHER LLOYD. (RIDENOUR, MICHAEL)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Process Plus Legal Service LLC re: served Complaint upon Christopher Lloyd on 06/17/2021 (KOLMAN, TIMOTHY)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Process Plus Legal Service LLC re: served Complaint upon Mary W. Boyer on 06/17/2021 (KOLMAN, TIMOTHY)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Process Plus Legal Service LLC re: served Complaint upon Cairn University on 06/17/2021 (KOLMAN, TIMOTHY)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE CAROL SANDREA MOORE WELLS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 6/25/21. 6/28/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
June 15, 2021 Summons Issued as to MARY W. BOYER, CAIRN UNIVERSITY, CHRISTOPHER LLOYD AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL (rf, )
June 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15191863.), filed by JOSEPH F. DUDASH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(KOLMAN, TIMOTHY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUDASH v. CAIRN UNIVERSITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH F. DUDASH
Represented By: TIMOTHY M. KOLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY W. BOYER
Represented By: MICHAEL D. RIDENOUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAIRN UNIVERSITY
Represented By: MICHAEL D. RIDENOUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER LLOYD
Represented By: MICHAEL D. RIDENOUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?