STIBI v. BUCKS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: MARIANGELA STIBI
Defendant: COUNTY OF BUCKS and BUCKS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 2:2021cv02766
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 10 REVISED NOTICE of Hearing: INITIAL PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 9/20/2021 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. COUNSEL SHOULD DIAL IN AS DIRECTED IN THE NOTICE. ENTERED 8/13/2021 AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sl, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: INITIAL PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/16/2021 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. COUNSEL SHOULD DIAL IN AS DIRECTED IN THE NOTICE. ENTERED 8/10/2021 AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sl, )
August 6, 2021 Filing 8 Answer and Affirmative Defenses on behalf of Defendants ANSWER to Complaint together with and Affirmative Defenses on behalf of Defendants by BUCKS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, COUNTY OF BUCKS.(ATKINS, MELISSA)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 8/6/21; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/15/21. 7/15/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint by BUCKS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, COUNTY OF BUCKS. (ATKINS, MELISSA)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA K. ATKINS on behalf of BUCKS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, COUNTY OF BUCKS (ATKINS, MELISSA)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARIANGELA STIBI re: Richard Scollon, Jr. - Seagull Legal Services, Inc. served Summons and Complaint upon COUNTY OF BUCKS by upon Janet Simon - Litigation Paralegal. COUNTY OF BUCKS served on 6/25/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. (FRANK, EVAN)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARIANGELA STIBI re: Richard Scollon, Jr. - Seagull Legal Services, Inc. served Summons and Complaint upon BUCKS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS by upon Michelle McLaughlin-Admin. Assistant. BUCKS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS served on 6/25/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. (FRANK, EVAN)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, )
June 24, 2021 Summons Issued as to BUCKS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, COUNTY OF BUCKS. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 6/24/21 (bw, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BUCKS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, COUNTY OF BUCKS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15205022.), filed by MARIANGELA STIBI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(FRANK, EVAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STIBI v. BUCKS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF BUCKS
Represented By: MELISSA K. ATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUCKS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: MELISSA K. ATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIANGELA STIBI
Represented By: EVAN LOUIS FRANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?