KING v. HOME DEPOT, USA, INC.
Plaintiff: WALLACE KING
Defendant: HOME DEPOT, USA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02799
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TOREMAND (ECF NO. 6), DEFENDANTS RESPONSE THERETO (ECF NO. 7), AND PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORTOF HIS MOTION (ECF NO. 9), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS:1. THE HEARING PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR MONDAY, DECEMBER 13, 2021 AT 10:00 AM ISCANCELLED;2. PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND (ECF NO. 6) IS GRANTED; AND3. PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES IS APPROVED FOR $5000.00.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/10/2021. 12/10/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
December 10, 2021 REMAND ORDER AND DOCKET EMAILED TO COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY. (sg, )
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND (DOCUMENT NO. 6), DEFENDANTS RESPONSE THERETO (DOCUMENT NO. 7), AND PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION (DOCUMENT NO. 9), IT IS ORDERED THAT ORAL ARGUMENT IS RESCHEDULEDTO DECEMBER 13, 2021 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 15B.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/8/2021. 12/9/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) Modified on 12/9/2021 (sg, ).
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE MATTER IS SCHEDULED FOR ORAL ARGUMENT ON 12/6/21 AT 10:00 A.M. ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/29/21. 9/29/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Support re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by WALLACE KING. (CHACKER, BRIAN)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE 7 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO FILE A REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 8/25/21. 8/25/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by HOME DEPOT, USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Memorandum, #7 Certificate of Service)(STRINGHAM, JOHN)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by WALLACE KING.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A-G, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CHACKER, BRIAN)
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN S. CHACKER on behalf of WALLACE KING (CHACKER, BRIAN)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT 10 DAYS PRIOR TO ANY MOTION BEING FILED COUNSEL MUST NOTIFY OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE POTENTIAL MOTION, AND THE POSSIBLE RESOLUTION OF SAME. THESE DISCUSSIONS SHALL BE SUBSTANTIVE AND NOT PERFUNCTORY. TO THIS END, COUNSEL SHALL PROVIDE THE OPPOSING PARTY WITH AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED DEFECTS PRIOR TO FILING A MOTION; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/25/21. 6/25/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt, )
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HOME DEPOT, USA, INC..(STRINGHAM, JOHN)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HOME DEPOT, USA, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15211466), filed by HOME DEPOT, USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B1, #6 Exhibit B2, #7 Exhibit B3, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E)(STRINGHAM, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KING v. HOME DEPOT, USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALLACE KING
Represented By: NICHOLAS S. KAMAU
Represented By: BRIAN S. CHACKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOME DEPOT, USA, INC.
Represented By: JOHN GRANT STRINGHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?