NELSON v. UNITED STATES CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: HANEEF SAKIN NELSON
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, UNITED STATES CORPORATION, RICHARD VANDERSLICE, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-1000, JOSEPH SMITH, STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA and QUEEN VILLAGE LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv02807
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: R BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HANEEF SAKIN NELSON re: Haikeem Nelson served Summons and Complaint upon QUEEN VILLAGE LLC by Personal Service. QUEEN VILLAGE LLC served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (fdc, )
July 23, 2021 Summons Issued as to CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, QUEEN VILLAGE LLC, JOSEPH SMITH, STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, UNITED STATES CORPORATION, RICHARD VANDERSLICE AND FORWARDED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF (rf, )
July 22, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number PPE229955. (sg, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 Letter dated 7/12/21. Per bank, checking account was closed. (sbt, )
July 6, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number PPE229304 (rf, )
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT IF NELSON SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, HE MUST, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER PAY (1) PAY $402 TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR (2) FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE NELSON WITH AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF THIS CASE. NELSON MAY USE THIS FORM TO SEEK LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IF HE CANNOT AFFORD TO PAY THE FEES TO COMMENCE THIS CASE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 6/28/21. 6/28/21 ENTERED AND MAILED TO PRO SE WITH FORMS.(JL )
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-1000, QUEEN VILLAGE LLC, JOSEPH SMITH, STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, UNITED STATES CORPORATION, RICHARD VANDERSLICE, filed by HANEEF SAKIN NELSON. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NELSON v. UNITED STATES CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD VANDERSLICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-1000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUEEN VILLAGE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANEEF SAKIN NELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?