ROSE v. DAVID DAVIS ENTERPRISES, INC.
Plaintiff: JOHN ROSE, III
Defendant: DAVID DAVIS ENTERPRISES, INC. doing business as DAVIS ACURA
Case Number: 2:2021cv02838
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by KALEIGH HARTIGAN on behalf of DAVID DAVIS ENTERPRISES, INC. with Certificate of Service(HARTIGAN, KALEIGH)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDAT, DAVID DAVIS ENTERPRISES, INC., IS GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 8/26/2021, TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/23/21. 7/23/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN ROSE, III re: Dennis Richman served Summons and Complaint upon DAVID DAVIS ENTERPRISES, INC. by Summons in a Civil Action. DAVID DAVIS ENTERPRISES, INC. served on 7/22/2021, answer due 8/12/2021. (MURPHY, MICHAEL)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL FENDELL SATINSKY on behalf of DAVID DAVIS ENTERPRISES, INC. (SATINSKY, RACHEL)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, )
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR on behalf of JOHN ROSE, III with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MURPHY, MICHAEL)
June 28, 2021 Summons Issued as to DAVID DAVIS ENTERPRISES, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 6/28/21 (bw, )
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAVID DAVIS ENTERPRISES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15215509.), filed by JOHN ROSE, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(SALVINA, BENJAMIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROSE v. DAVID DAVIS ENTERPRISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN ROSE, III
Represented By: BENJAMIN DAVID SALVINA
Represented By: MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID DAVIS ENTERPRISES, INC. doing business as DAVIS ACURA
Represented By: KALEIGH HARTIGAN
Represented By: RACHEL FENDELL SATINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?