SHARIFI v. AMERICAN RED CROSS et al
Plaintiff: PARASTU SHARIFI
Defendant: HEALTH PROFESSIONAL & ALLIED EMPLOYEES, LISA SCARAMUZZO, BRIAN CAREY, AMERICAN RED CROSS, GABE ENCARNACION, HAMMAD KAHN and LABOR UNION LOCAL
Case Number: 2:2021cv02873
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE FILED IN ERROR. FILED IN CORRECT CASE 21-2285. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 8/16/21. 8/16/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) Modified on 8/16/2021 (amas, ). (Main Document 10 replaced on 8/16/2021) (amas, ).
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (DOC. NO. #8 ) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ATTEMPT TO APPOINT COUNSEL FROM THE COURT'S ATTORNEY PANEL. THIS CASE IS PLACED IN SUSPENSE FOR 60 DAYS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 8/16/21. 8/16/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, )
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL filed by PARASTU SHARIFI. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(jaa, )
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION (ECF NO. 6) IS GRANTED. UPON COMPLETION OF SERVICE UPON ALL DEFENDANTS, PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE ON ECF AFFIDAVIT(S) OF SERVICE, AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS, STATING THE DATE(S) SERVICE WAS COMPLETED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 8/3/21.8/6/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION FOR SPECIAL APPOINTMENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS filed by PARASTU SHARIFI. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(jaa, )
July 29, 2021 PLEADING #5 MAILED TO THE UNREPS (JL )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO HOLD IN ABEYANCE (ECF NO. 4) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 7/28/21.7/28/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO UNREPS. (jaa, )
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION TO HOLD IN ABEYANCE filed by PARASTU SHARIFI. (Attachments: #1 EMAIL)(jaa, )
July 23, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number PPE229970 (rf, )
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 7/15/21. 7/15/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
July 1, 2021 COPY OF EMPLOYMENT PACKET HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE, SHARIFI. (bw, )
June 30, 2021 Summons Issued as to AMERICAN RED CROSS, BRIAN CAREY, GABE ENCARNACION, HEALTH PROFESSIONAL & ALLIED EMPLOYEES, HAMMAD KAHN, LISA SCARAMUZZO. E-MAILED To: PRO SE on 6/30/21 (bw, )
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN RED CROSS, BRIAN CAREY, GABE ENCARNACION, HEALTH PROFESSIONAL & ALLIED EMPLOYEES, HAMMAD KAHN, LISA SCARAMUZZO (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by PARASTU SHARIFI.(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHARIFI v. AMERICAN RED CROSS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTH PROFESSIONAL & ALLIED EMPLOYEES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA SCARAMUZZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN CAREY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN RED CROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GABE ENCARNACION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMMAD KAHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LABOR UNION LOCAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARASTU SHARIFI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?