BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 PENSION FUND et al v. CHURCHVILLE MECHANICAL, INC.
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 ANNUITY FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 WELFARE FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 EDUCATIONAL/PAC FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 PENSION FUND, LOCAL UNION #74 OF THE UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPEFITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 SCHOLARSHIP FUND and BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 APPRENTICESHIP FUND
Defendant: CHURCHVILLE MECHANICAL, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02892
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: KAREN S MARSTON
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Default Entered. (va, )
August 4, 2021 DEFAULT BY CHURCHVILLE MECHANICAL, INC. FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (va, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST for Entry of Default pursuant to F.R.C.P. 55(a) filed by BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 EDUCATIONAL/PAC FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 ANNUITY FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 APPRENTICESHIP FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 PENSION FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 SCHOLARSHIP FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 WELFARE FUND, LOCAL UNION #74 OF THE UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPEFITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA.Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dawn Costa, Esquire, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(COSTA, DAWN) Modified on 8/5/2021 (md, ).
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 EDUCATIONAL/PAC FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 WELFARE FUND, LOCAL UNION #74 OF THE UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPEFITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 ANNUITY FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 PENSION FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 SCHOLARSHIP FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 APPRENTICESHIP FUND re: Eric Afflerbach served Summons and Complaint upon CHURCHVILLE MECHANICAL, INC. by handing documents to a manager/person in charge. CHURCHVILLE MECHANICAL, INC. served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (COSTA, DAWN)
July 1, 2021 Summons Issued as to CHURCHVILLE MECHANICAL, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/1/21 (bw, )
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 EDUCATIONAL/PAC FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 ANNUITY FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 APPRENTICESHIP FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 PENSION FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 SCHOLARSHIP FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 WELFARE FUND, LOCAL UNION #74 OF THE UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPEFITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA.(COSTA, DAWN)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHURCHVILLE MECHANICAL, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15221730.), filed by BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 EDUCATIONAL/PAC FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 WELFARE FUND, LOCAL UNION #74 OF THE UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPEFITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 ANNUITY FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 PENSION FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 SCHOLARSHIP FUND, BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 APPRENTICESHIP FUND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7)(COSTA, DAWN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 PENSION FUND et al v. CHURCHVILLE MECHANICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 ANNUITY FUND
Represented By: DAWN M. COSTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 WELFARE FUND
Represented By: DAWN M. COSTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 EDUCATIONAL/PAC FUND
Represented By: DAWN M. COSTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 PENSION FUND
Represented By: DAWN M. COSTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOCAL UNION #74 OF THE UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPEFITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA
Represented By: DAWN M. COSTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Represented By: DAWN M. COSTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL UNION NO. 74 APPRENTICESHIP FUND
Represented By: DAWN M. COSTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHURCHVILLE MECHANICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?