SOUZA et al v. M.A.G. ENTERPRISES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DENISE TRLICA, ALANA MARIE SOUZA, Laurie Young, Laurie Romeo, JAIME EDMONDSON LONGORIA, DENISE MILANI, LUCY PINDER, ALANA CAMPOS and DENISE MILANI TRLICA
Defendant: M.A.G. ENTERPRISES, INC. doing business as CHEERLEADERS and JOHN MEEHAN
Case Number: 2:2021cv02913
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M YOUNGE
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION OF JOHN V. GOLASZEWSKI, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 8/27/21. 8/27/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO UNREP. (jaa, )
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John V. Golaszewski, Esquire by JAIME EDMONDSON LONGORIA, LUCY PINDER, ALANA MARIE SOUZA, DENISE MILANI TRLICA, Laurie Young. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15363231.). (WEINSTEIN, HILLARY)
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John V. Golaszewski, Esquire by JAIME EDMONDSON LONGORIA, LUCY PINDER, ALANA MARIE SOUZA, DENISE MILANI TRLICA, Laurie Young.. (WEINSTEIN, HILLARY)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED THAT A FED. R. CIV. P. 16 CONFERENCE WITH THE COURT WILL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 21, 2021, AT 10 A.M. COUNSEL SHALL APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AND WILL BE NOTIFIED BY CHAMBERS STAFF VIA EMAIL OF THE CONFERENCE DIALING INSTRUCTIONS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 8/25/21. 8/25/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP.(jaa, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed by Richard Scollon, Jr. re: served Summons and Complaint upon MAG Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Cheerleaders by personal service on July 7, 2021 (WEINSTEIN, HILLARY) Modified on 8/5/2021 (tjd).
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Returned Executed by Richard Scollon, Jr. re: served Summons and Complaint upon John Meehan by personal service on July 7, 2021 (WEINSTEIN, HILLARY) Modified on 8/5/2021 (tjd).
July 1, 2021 Summons Issued as to M.A.G. ENTERPRISES, INC., JOHN MEEHAN. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/1/21 (bw, )
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15224451.), filed by Laurie Young, LUCY PINDER, ALANA MARIE SOUZA, DENISE TRLICA, JAIME EDMONDSON LONGORIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover, #2 Designation Form Designation, #3 Exhibit A-E)(WEINSTEIN, HILLARY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOUZA et al v. M.A.G. ENTERPRISES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE TRLICA
Represented By: HILLARY B. WEINSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALANA MARIE SOUZA
Represented By: HILLARY B. WEINSTEIN
Represented By: JOHN V. GOLASZEWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Young
Represented By: HILLARY B. WEINSTEIN
Represented By: JOHN V. GOLASZEWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Romeo
Represented By: HILLARY B. WEINSTEIN
Represented By: JOHN V. GOLASZEWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAIME EDMONDSON LONGORIA
Represented By: HILLARY B. WEINSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE MILANI
Represented By: HILLARY B. WEINSTEIN
Represented By: JOHN V. GOLASZEWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCY PINDER
Represented By: HILLARY B. WEINSTEIN
Represented By: JOHN V. GOLASZEWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALANA CAMPOS
Represented By: HILLARY B. WEINSTEIN
Represented By: JOHN V. GOLASZEWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE MILANI TRLICA
Represented By: JOHN V. GOLASZEWSKI
Represented By: HILLARY B. WEINSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.A.G. ENTERPRISES, INC. doing business as CHEERLEADERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN MEEHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?