POPLAWSKI v. VILARINO et al
Plaintiff: RICHARD A. POPLAWSKI
Defendant: JAYMMIE M. VILARINO, J.M. POPLAWSKI, HON. JOSH SHAPIRO and JOHN DOE
Case Number: 2:2021cv03084
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 1 Summons Returned Unexecuted by RICHARD A. POPLAWSKI as to JAYMMIE M. VILARINO. (amas, )
August 25, 2021 Filing 9 RENEWED MOTION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF RICHARD A. POPLAWSKI, TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. (DT) (ENVELOPE ATTACHED)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL PAY THE FULL FILING FEE OF $350 IN INSTALLMENTS REGARDLESS OF THE OUTCOME OF THIS CASE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE SUPERINTENDENT OF SCI-PHOENIX. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. SERVICE OF THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT SHALL BE MADE UPON THE DEFENDANTS BY THE US MARSHALS SERVICE. FURTHER INFORMATION OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/23/21. 8/23/21 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. (amas, )
August 23, 2021 A COPY OF DOC. NO. 8 WAS FAXED TO THE WARDEN OF SCI PHOENIX ON 8/23/21. (amas, )
August 23, 2021 Summons Issued as to JOSH SHAPIRO, JAYMMIE M. VILARINO. Forwarded To: US MARSHALS on 8/23/21 (amas, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 AUTHORIZATION FORM, FILED BY RICHARD A. POPLAWSKI. (amas, )
July 27, 2021 MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #5 TO PLAINTIFF ON 7/27/21. (jaa, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by RICHARD A. POPLAWSKI. (amas, )
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT POPLAWSKI'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IF POPLAWSKI SEEKS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, HE SHALL, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. ALTERNATIVELY, POPLAWSKI CAN PROCEED BY SUBMITTING $402 TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 7/26/21.7/26/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(amas, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 4 DECLARATION OF COMPLIANCE, FILED BY RICHARD A. POPLAWSKI. (amas, )
July 13, 2021 COPY OF PRO SE GUIDELINES HAVE BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE, POPLAWSKI. (bw, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE, JOSH SHAPIRO, JAYMMIE M. VILARINO, filed by RICHARD A. POPLAWSKI. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(bw, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by RICHARD A. POPLAWSKI..(bw, )
July 12, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by RICHARD A. POPLAWSKI. (bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POPLAWSKI v. VILARINO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAYMMIE M. VILARINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.M. POPLAWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HON. JOSH SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD A. POPLAWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?