ORTIZ v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Plaintiff: ANDY ORTIZ
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, BLANCHE CARNEY, PHILADELPHIA DEPARTMENT OF PRISONS, C/O LAWTON, SGT. DAVID GILL and SGT./SUPERVISOR MAJOR MARTIN
Case Number: 2:2021cv03100
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by ANDY ORTIZ., Envelope Attached (rf, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL filed by ANDY ORTIZ., *Envelope Attached*.(rf, )
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IF ORITZ SEEKS TO PROCEED IFP HE SHALL WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THIS ORDER, FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT, ETC. ALTERNATIVELY, ORTIZ CAN PAY $402 TO THE CLERK OF COURT. MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 7/15/21. 7/16/21 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO ORTIZ. (rf, )(rf, )
July 13, 2021 COPY OF PRO SE GUIDELINES HAVE BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE, ORTIZ. (bw, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by ANDY ORTIZ..(bw, ) Modified on 7/13/2021 (bw, ).
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by ANDY ORTIZ. (bw, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against BLANCHE CARNEY, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DAVID GILL, LAWTON, MAJOR MARTIN, PHILADELPHIA DEPARTMENT OF PRISONS, filed by ANDY ORTIZ.(bw, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ANDY ORTIZ..(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ORTIZ v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDY ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLANCHE CARNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA DEPARTMENT OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O LAWTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. DAVID GILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT./SUPERVISOR MAJOR MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?