Wu v. 3 Bulls USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: En Guang Wu
Defendant: 3 Bulls USA, Inc. and Jue Ning Chen
Case Number: 2:2021cv03110
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOEL H SLOMSKY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS 3 BULLS USA INC AND JUE NING CHEN HAVE UNTIL 9/16/21 TO FILE AND SERVE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 8/24/21. 8/25/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by 3 Bulls USA, Inc., Jue Ning Chen. (DEVLIN, DANIEL)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. DEVLIN on behalf of 3 Bulls USA, Inc., Jue Ning Chen (DEVLIN, DANIEL)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE Re: accepted summons and complaint for En Guang Wu on 8/17/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (DENNIS, RACHEL)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Thomas J. Crean, Jr. re: served Complaint/Summons on 8/2/2021 (DENNIS, RACHEL)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Thomas J. Crean, Jr. re: served Complaint on 7/15/2021 (DENNIS, RACHEL)
July 14, 2021 Summons Issued as to 3 Bulls USA, Inc., Jue Ning Chen. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/14/21 (bw, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3 Bulls USA, Inc., Jue Ning Chen ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15250412.), filed by En Guang Wu.(DENNIS, RACHEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wu v. 3 Bulls USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: En Guang Wu
Represented By: RACHEL DENNIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3 Bulls USA, Inc.
Represented By: DANIEL J. DEVLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jue Ning Chen
Represented By: DANIEL J. DEVLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?