Lawrence v. DOAR, INC.
Plaintiff: Jennifer Lynn Lawrence
Defendant: DOAR, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv03269
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B TUCKER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 Letter dated September 15, 2021 by DOAR, INC.. (SEIDLIN-BERNSTEIN, ELIZABETH)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 Response to Defendant's request to stay deadline by Jennifer Lynn Lawrence. (CASTOR, BRUCE)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 Letter dated August 30, 2021 by DOAR, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SEIDLIN-BERNSTEIN, ELIZABETH)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by DOAR, INC..(SEIDLIN-BERNSTEIN, ELIZABETH)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY; ETC.. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 8/10/21. 8/10/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
July 27, 2021 Summons Issued as to DOAR, INC.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 7/27/2021 (sg, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOAR, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15270023.), filed by Jennifer Lynn Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(CASTOR, BRUCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence v. DOAR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Lynn Lawrence
Represented By: BRUCE L CASTOR, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOAR, INC.
Represented By: ELIZABETH SEIDLIN-BERNSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?