CLARK et al v. GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY
Plaintiff: SUE CLARK and JOSEPH CLARK
Defendant: GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY and GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY doing business as GEICO
Case Number: 2:2021cv03270
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: BERLE M SCHILLER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR WEDNESDAY 10/27/2021 AT 10:30 AM VIA TELEPHONE BEFORE THE HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER; CALL-IN NUMBER IS 888-684-8852 (ACCESS CODE: 9715761#). IT IS EXPECTED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL HAVE CONDUCTED SUBSTANTIAL DISCOVERY BY THE TIME OF THE RULE 16 CONFERENCE. ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED (jp, )
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Montgomery County. (fdc)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, MAY SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF THIS COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT, SO THAT THEY CAN BE FILED IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 7/30/21. 7/30/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(FRIEDMAN, DAVID)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15270095), filed by GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Declaration, #5 Exhibit)(FRIEDMAN, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLARK et al v. GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUE CLARK
Represented By: RYAN JABLONSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH CLARK
Represented By: RYAN JABLONSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: DAVID RONALD FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY doing business as GEICO
Represented By: DAVID RONALD FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?