GARCIA v. JACKSON
Plaintiff: NOEL GARCIA
Defendant: DET. YUSEF JACKSON
Case Number: 2:2021cv03284
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M GALLAGHER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION TO THE COURT, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE AND CERTIFICATE OF MERIT, FILED BY NOEL GARCIA. (amas, )
September 9, 2021 Filing 9 ALLOWANCE FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY NOEL GARCIA. (amas, )
August 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION TO COURT IN REGARDS TO SEC 1983, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY NOEL GARCIA.(amas, )
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION TO THE COURT, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY NOEL GARCIA. (amas, )
July 27, 2021 MAILED OUT PRO SE GUIDELINES #6 TO PLAINTIFF ON 7/27/21. (jaa, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (amas, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY filed by NOEL GARCIA..(amas, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against YUSEF JACKSON, filed by NOEL GARCIA.(amas, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against YUSEF JACKSON, filed by NOEL GARCIA.(amas, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by NOEL GARCIA. (amas, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by NOEL GARCIA.(amas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARCIA v. JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOEL GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DET. YUSEF JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?