Meyers v. TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: Ellen M. Meyers
Defendant: TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2021cv03291
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 10/15/2021. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 10/22/2021. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 8/16/2021. 8/17/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING #3 MOTION TO REMAND BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 08/16/2021.08/16/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Remand filed by TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief)(FOLAND, BROOKS)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (JL )
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 Report Of Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting by TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (FOLAND, BROOKS)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/16/2021 03:00 PM THE PARTIES SHALL CONFER AS TO WHO WILL SCHEDULE AND CIRCULATE ZOOM INFORMATION TO CHAMBERS AT chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.gov.BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. (Attachments: #1 ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDER, #2 JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26 F)(amw, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY.(FOLAND, BROOKS)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand filed by Ellen M. Meyers.Memorandum and Certificate of SErvice. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(HAGGERTY, JAMES)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY.(FOLAND, BROOKS)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15273358), filed by TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit A - Philadelphia Complaint, #4 Exhibit Ex B - Notice of Service of Process, #5 Exhibit Ex C - Entry of Appearance)(FOLAND, BROOKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyers v. TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen M. Meyers
Represented By: JAMES C. HAGGERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: BROOKS FOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?