RIDEOUT, ET AL. v. WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.
Plaintiff: JUDSON A. RIDEOUT, Jay J Rideout and Joseph M Rideout
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.
Case Number: 2:2021cv03326
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by Jay J Rideout, Joseph M Rideout, JUDSON A. RIDEOUT re #9 Amended Complaint, Redacted refiled EXHIBIT "D", Doc.No. 9-4 (FILIPOVIC, PREDRAG)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES ARE ATTACHED FOR A FOUR-DAY JURY TRIAL BEGINNING 2/15/22 AND SHALL PROCEED CONSISTENT WITH FRCP 1 TO RESOLVE THIS DISPUTE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEAL ECF DOC NO. 9-4 AND PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A NOTICE ATTACHING A PROPERLY REDACTED EXHIBIT D NO LATER THAN 9/24/21. ALL FACT AND EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 12/30/21. THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE HEFFLEY FOR ALL SETTLEMENT PURPOSES. SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 1/7/22. NO LATER THAN 1/31/22 EACH PARTY SHALL FILE A PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD TELEPHONICALLY ON 2/14/22 AT 8:45 AM. COUNSEL IS ATTACHED FOR JURY SELECTION FOLLOWED BY A FOURT-DAY TRIAL BEGINNING ON 2/15/22 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM 6-B. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/22/21. 9/22/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT A PARTY'S DISCLOSURE IN THIS LITIGATION OF A COMMUNICATION OR INFORMATION COVERED BY THE ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE OR ENTITLED TO WORK-PRODUCT PROTECTION DOES NOT CONSTITUTE A WAIVER OF SUCH PRIVILEGE OR PROTECTION EITHER IN THIS LITIGATION OR IN ANY OTHER FEDERAL OR STATE PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/22/21. 9/22/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY Pretrial/RULE 16 Conference held on 9/22/21. (JL )
September 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Jay J Rideout, Joseph M Rideout, JUDSON A. RIDEOUT Rule 26(f) Joint Report and Statement of Undisputed Facts (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(FILIPOVIC, PREDRAG)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/16/21.9/16/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo N.A. against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JUDSON A. RIDEOUT, Jay J Rideout, Joseph M Rideout. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Designation Form, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Case Management Track Form)(FILIPOVIC, PREDRAG)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED AND RICHARD THOMSON ESQUIRE IS ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN THIS CASE IN THIS COURT UNDER LOCAL RULE 83.5.2(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/9/21.9/9/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Richard Thomson, Esq. filed by WELLS FARGO BANK N.A...(KERNER, JUSTIN)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT WE WILL HOLD AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE INCLUDING ARGUMENT ON ANY THEN-PENDING MOTIONS VIA TELEPHONE ON 9/22/21 AT 9:00 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/8/21. 9/8/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by WELLS FARGO BANK N.A..Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(KERNER, JUSTIN)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Jay J Rideout, Joseph M Rideout, JUDSON A. RIDEOUT. (FILIPOVIC, PREDRAG)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.. (KERNER, JUSTIN)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL NO LATER THAN 8/17/21 EITHER FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT OR SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY WE SHOULD NOT DISMISS THE PRESENTLY FILED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. THE PARTIES' ATTACHED STIPULATION IS APPROVED IN PART AND DEFENDANT MAY RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT NO LATER RTHAN 9/7/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/10/21. 8/10/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank National Association ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15291580.), filed by Judson Rideout, Jay J Rideout, Joseph M Rideout. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Court Order_settlement), #2 Exhibit DraftstoPlaintiffsnamesonly, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit WFAccntopeningFrauddocs, #5 Exhibit, #6 Designation Form, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Case Management Track Form)(FILIPOVIC, PREDRAG)
July 27, 2021 Summons Issued as to WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. E-mailed to counsel on 7/27/21 (mbh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIDEOUT, ET AL. v. WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDSON A. RIDEOUT
Represented By: PREDRAG FILIPOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay J Rideout
Represented By: PREDRAG FILIPOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M Rideout
Represented By: PREDRAG FILIPOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.
Represented By: JUSTIN EDWARD KERNER
Represented By: RICHARD THOMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?